This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2021 at 08:38:02 (UTC).

Hopkins v. Econo Lodge Tucumcari et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 Hopkins filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Econo Lodge Tucumcari. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carmen E. Garza and Gregory J. Fouratt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00563

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carmen E. Garza

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pamela Hopkins

Defendants

1st American Hospitality, Inc.

Econo Lodge Tucumcari d/b/a Choice Hotels International Services Corp

Econo Lodge Tucumcari doing business as Choice Hotels International Services Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David M Houliston

Attorney at The Law Offices of David M Houliston

7500 Jefferson Street Ne, Suite 106

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Defendant Attorneys

Monica R Garcia

Attorney at BUTT THORNTON & BAEHR PC

4101 Indian School Rd. Ne., Suite 300S, P.O. Box 3170

Albuquerque, NM 87190

John A Frase

Attorney at Hinkle Law Office

3939 San Pedro Blvd, Ne, Bldg A

Albuquerque, NM 87110

Kenneth Ferguson

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

901 S. Mopac Expressway

Ste Bldg. 1, SUIT 480

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Econo Lodge Tucumcari (Ferguson, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#10

(#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16 set for 9/22/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/24/2021. (nmh) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Ferguson on behalf of Econo Lodge Tucumcari (Ferguson, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Econo Lodge Tucumcari. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Pamela Hopkins.(Ferguson, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by 1st American Hospitality, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Pamela Hopkins.(Garcia, Monica) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R Garcia on behalf of 1st American Hospitality, Inc. (Garcia, Monica) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Hopkins. Econo Lodge Tucumcari served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (Houliston, David) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Hopkins. 1st American Hospitality, Inc. served on 6/21/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Houliston, David) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Econo Lodge Tucumcari (Ferguson, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16 set for 9/22/2021 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The parties shall call the Court's conference line at (888) 363-4735 and use access code 9873158 to connect to the proceedings. Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2021. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 8/24/2021. (nmh) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth Ferguson on behalf of Econo Lodge Tucumcari (Ferguson, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Econo Lodge Tucumcari. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Pamela Hopkins.(Ferguson, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by 1st American Hospitality, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Pamela Hopkins.(Garcia, Monica) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Monica R Garcia on behalf of 1st American Hospitality, Inc. (Garcia, Monica) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Hopkins. Econo Lodge Tucumcari served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (Houliston, David) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pamela Hopkins. 1st American Hospitality, Inc. served on 6/21/2021, answer due 7/12/2021. (Houliston, David) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to 1st American Hospitality, Inc., Econo Lodge Tucumcari. (jg) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docket(#3) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Pamela Hopkins voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Houliston, David)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 402 receipt number ANMDC-7749035 re #1 Complaint, filed by Pamela Hopkins (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Houliston, David) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Carmen E. Garza and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (jg) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOffice code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (jg) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Personal Injuries and Damages against 1st American Hospitality, Inc., Econo Lodge Tucumcari d/b/a Choice Hotels International Services Corp ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Pamela Hopkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Houliston, David) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Choice Hotels International, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M Houliston