This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2021 at 09:12:00 (UTC).

Hopson v. American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Hopson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Campbell Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00176

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Campbell Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen Hopson

Defendant

American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Charles Homer Clark

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles H.Clark, P.C.

604 West Woldert

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorney

Stephanie Ng

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, PC - Houston

500 Dallas Street, Suite 3000

Houston, TX 77002-4709

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Karen Hopson Initial Disclosure (Clark, Charles) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATUS REPORT by Karen Hopson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clark, Charles) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER resetting the pretrial hearing in this case to 7/9/2021 at 10:00 a.m. Ordered by Judge J. Campbell Barker on 6/3/2021. (mll, ) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GOVERNING PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS. Rule 16 Pretrial Teleconference set for 7/11/2021 10:00 AM before District Judge J. Campbell Barker. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 05/28/21. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus (Ng, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER adopting in this case Judge Barker's standing orders, which may be obtained from his page on the court's website and may be updated without separate docket entry. All parties and counsel are ordered to stay abreast of the current standing orders and to comply with those orders and with the courts local rules. Noncompliance with those standing orders or local rules may result in a sanction or other disadvantage. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDistrict Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #2 Complaint by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus. (Filed in state court as "Defendant's Original Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Original Petition")(mll, ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by Karen Hopson. (mll, ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus, filed by Karen Hopson. (Filed in state court as "Plaintiff's Original Petition and Request for Disclosure")(mll, ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus from Smith County District Court, case number 21-0491-B. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8394266), filed by American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B -- Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ng, Stephanie) Modified on 5/5/2021 (mll, ). (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Family Life Assurance Company of Columbus is a litigant