This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2021 at 08:11:13 (UTC).

Hopkins et al v. Vivint Solar Developer, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Hopkins filed an Other lawsuit against Vivint Solar Developer, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is James K. Bredar. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01709

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James K. Bredar

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Hopkins

Joyce Hopkins

Evetta Hopkins

Defendant

Vivint Solar Developer, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Derek A. Hills

Attorney at The Law Office of Derek A. Hills

700 Elizabeth Street

Easton, MD 21601

Peter A Holland

Attorney at The Holland Law Firm PC

914 Bay Ridge Road, Suite 230

Annapolis, MD 21403

Defendant Attorney

Julia K Whitelock

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

1101 King Street, Suite 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

8 #3

Text of Proposed Order

8 #2

Exhibit 1

8 #1

Memorandum in Support

#8

#7

#5

#4

3 #1

Case Information Report

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit 2- Summons

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting #9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Evetta Hopkins, Joyce Hopkins, William Hopkins. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/30/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Evetta Hopkins, Joyce Hopkins, William Hopkins (Hills, Derek) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Vivint Solar Developer, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Whitelock, Julia) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter A Holland on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Holland, Peter) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket(#6) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/13/2021. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR KENT COUNTY, MARYLAND. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued 30 days as to Vivint Solar Developer, LLC.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request to Issue Summons by Evetta Hopkins, Joyce Hopkins, William Hopkins (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT against Vivint Solar Developer, LLC, filed by William Hopkins, Joyce Hopkins, Evetta Hopkins. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Vivint Solar Developer, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Sunrun, Inc. for Vivint Solar Developer, LLC.(Whitelock, Julia) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Kent County, case number C-14-CV-21-000030. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9370085), filed by Vivint Solar Developer, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2- Summons)(Whitelock, Julia) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vivint Solar Developer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julia Kim Whitelock