This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2021 at 10:09:36 (UTC).

Hope Surrogacy, Inc. v. Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 Hope Surrogacy, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01028

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hope Surrogacy, Inc.

Defendant

Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura M Konkel

Attorney at Michael Best & Friedrich

One S Pinckney Street, Suite 700

Madison, WI 53703

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Printouts from TSDR

1 #2

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

1 #4

Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action

#2

#3

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC. Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (Konkel, Laura) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (kwf) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC. (kwf) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketStandard attachments for District Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (kwf) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (kwf) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Hope Surrogacy, Inc.. (Konkel, Laura) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against Carrying Hope Surrogacy, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2782140.) TRADEMARKS AT ISSUE: Trademark # 5971603, issued 01/28/2020, held by Hope Surrogacy; Trademark # 5971607, issued 01/28/2020, held by Hope Surrogacy, filed by Hope Surrogacy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Printouts from TSDR, #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Konkel, Laura) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura M Konkel