This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2022 at 07:03:23 (UTC).

Travonne Hooks v. Dignity Health et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 Travonne Hooks filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Dignity Health. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia Donahue and Dale S. Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-07699

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Travonne Hooks

Defendant

Dignity Health

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gil Melili

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

245 Fischer Avenue Suite D1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Seyed Abbas Kazerounian

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

245 Fischer Avenue Suite D1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Jason A Ibey

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

321 N Mall Drive Suite R108

St George, UT 84790

Pamela Erin Prescott

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

245 Fischer Avenue Unit D1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Reza Torkzadeh

Attorney at Torkzadeh Law Firm

18650 Macarthur Boulevard No 300

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant Attorneys

Lara S Garner

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West 5Th Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Craig J Mariam

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully and Mansukhani LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Rachel N. Rivers

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West 5Th Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

20 #12

Certificate Of Service

20 #11

Proposed Order

20 #10

Exhibit H

20 #9

Exhibit G

20 #8

Exhibit F

20 #7

Exhibit E

20 #4

Exhibit B

20 #3

Exhibit A

#20

(#22) [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED DATED ON 11/22/2022, SEE DOCKET NO. #23 ] - NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Travonne Hooks #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No notice of interested parties. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp). Modified on 11/22/2022 (jp). (Entered: 11/22/2022)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dignity Health, identifying Dignity Health, CommonSpirit Health, Travonne Hooks. (Mariam, Craig) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Dignity Health. (Mariam, Craig) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Declaration in Support of Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

#1

CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Dignity Health. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/20/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes the Motion #20 set for Monday, December 19, 2022 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 filed by Plaintiff Travonne Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ibey, Jason) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Notice of Withdrawal of Reply (Motion related) #28 filed by Plaintiff Travonne Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ibey, Jason) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 filed by Plaintiff Travonne Hooks. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ibey, Jason) (Entered: 12/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DEFENDANT DIGNITY HEALTHS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND MATTER TO STATE COURT OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #20 filed by Defendant Dignity Health. (Rivers, Rachel) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 2/13/24. (rfi) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Order re Jury Trial by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The parties' proposed class certification schedule is approved, except the hearing will be set for June 26, 2023. These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine, unless the Court orders otherwise. See Trial Order for specifics. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2024 at 3:00 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. Jury Trial set for 5/7/2024 at 8:30 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • Docket(#24) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) SCHEDULING ORDER. The Court takes the Scheduling Conference off calendar and establishes the case management dates as proposed by parties in the Joint Rule 26(f) Report as further described in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates except as noted in the Order re Trial. (See Order re Trial for specific dates and times.) These dates and requirements are firm. The Court is very unlikely to grant continuances unless the parties establish good cause through a concrete showing. Failure to complete discovery in a timely manner does not constitute good cause, nor does the fact that a settlement conference is pending. Each side is limited to five motions in limine unless the Court orders otherwise. All fictitiously named defendants are dismissed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rfi) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) #22 was issue in error. A Notice of Interested Parties was previously filed on 11/4/2022 (DE #15 ). Please disregard Notice of Deficiencies (DE 22). (jp) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED DATED ON 11/22/2022, SEE DOCKET NO. #23 ] - NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Travonne Hooks #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: (1) No notice of interested parties. (2) Counsel must comply with Local Rule 7.1-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (jp). Modified on 11/22/2022 (jp). (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 11/28/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Dignity Health. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 10/20/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Dignity Health, Does. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Travonne Hooks. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 9/20/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 10/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dignity Health, identifying Dignity Health, CommonSpirit Health, Travonne Hooks. (Mariam, Craig) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Dignity Health. (Mariam, Craig) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV30675 Receipt No: ACACDC-34196331 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Dignity Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Declaration in Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Craig J Mariam added to party Dignity Health(pty:dft))(Mariam, Craig) (Entered: 10/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less