This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/09/2021 at 08:08:20 (UTC).

Hood v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Hood filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jill N. Parrish and Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00069

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jill N. Parrish

Referral Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cody Hood

Defendant

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Nord

Attorney at SAGE LAW PARTNERS LLC

140 N Union Ave Ste 220

Farmington, UT 84025

Defendant Attorneys

Samantha E. Wilcox

Attorney at GOEBEL ANDERSON PC

405 S Main St Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Mark L. Anderson

Attorney at GOEBEL ANDERSON PC

405 S Main St Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order

#10

#9

#7

#6

5 #5

Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification

5 #4

Notice of Removal

5 #3

Complaint & Notice of Service Return of Electronic Notification

5 #2

Notice of Service

5 #1

Complaint

#5

#4

#3

2 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet

#2

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/11/2022. Motions due by 5/18/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jill N. Parrish. See order for additional dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 6/21/21. (alf) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Nord, Ryan) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/20/21. (alf) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/19/21. (ss) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance.(Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 5/14/21. (ss) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) File downloaded from 2nd District Court, Davis County consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Service, Notice of Removal and all applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Service, #3 Complaint & Notice of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #4 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance, Plaintiff Cody Hood. (mh) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 2nd District, Davis County, case number 210700330, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4001941) filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Document, #4 Exhibit 4 - Corporate Disclosure Statement, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Jill N. Parrish. Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (mh) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Nord