This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2020 at 07:51:32 (UTC).

Hood et al v. Singh et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Hood filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Singh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is David L. Russell. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01159

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nichole R Hood

Kirstan Bennett

Kylie Bennett

Brandon Bennett

Defendants

EK Carriers Inc

Angrej Singh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jerry W Foshee

Attorney at Cain Law Office

P O Box 890420

Oklahoma City, OK 73189

Christopher W Foshee

Attorney at Cain Law Office

P O Box 890420

Oklahoma City, OK 73189

Monty L Cain

Attorney at Cain Law Office

P O Box 892098

Oklahoma City, OK 73189

Defendant Attorneys

Eric L Clark

Attorney at Edmonds Cole Law Firm

Seven S Mickey Mantle Dr, 2Nd Floor

Oklahoma City, OK 73104-2458

Dan S Folluo

Attorney at Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable

Po Box 21100

Tulsa, OK 74121-1100

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Order for Response, to Defendants' Motion to Transfer by All Plaintiffs. (Cain, Monty) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Carter County District Court, case number CJ-2019-158 filed by EK Carriers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2-Petition, #3 Exhibit 3-EOA J. Foshee & C. Foshee, #4 Exhibit 4-Amended Notice of Publication, #5 Exhibit 5-Affidavit for Service by Publication, #6 Exhibit 6-Summons Issued to Removing Defendant, #7 Exhibit 7-Summons Issued to Defendant Singh, #8 Exhibit 8-Notice of Filing Removal to Federal Court, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Response re #3 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by EK Carriers Inc. Upon review, the Court orders Plaintiff to respond to Defendants transfer request by January 9, 2020. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/30/19. (jw) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit 8-Notice of Filing Removal to Federal Court

1 #4

Exhibit 4-Amended Notice of Publication

#9

(#9) ORDER; re #3 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by EK Carriers Inc. Accordingly, Defendant requests that the Court transfer the case to the Eastern District, where venue is proper. Plaintiff does not object,this case to be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 1/13/20. (jw) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit 1-State Court Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ; Defendant is hereby ordered to show cause for their removal within seven days of the date of this order and to demonstrate whether the action should be remanded to the District Court of Carter County, Oklahoma or transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/16/19. (jw) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#5

(#5) Receipt for Money Received from Angrej Singh in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500077873 regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, (kmt) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#7

(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Monty L Cain on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cain, Monty) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit 6-Summons Issued to Removing Defendant

1 #5

Exhibit 5-Affidavit for Service by Publication

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Folluo, Dan) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#3

(#3) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by EK Carriers Inc. (Clark, Eric) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

1 #7

Exhibit 7-Summons Issued to Defendant Singh

1 #3

Exhibit 3-EOA J. Foshee & C. Foshee

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • Docket Annotation: Case transferred from Oklahoma Western has been opened in Eastern District of Oklahoma as case 6:20-cv-00016, filed 01/14/2020. (kmt) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • Docket Annotation: Case sent to the Eastern District of Oklahoma. (kmt) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER; re #3 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by EK Carriers Inc. Accordingly, Defendant requests that the Court transfer the case to the Eastern District, where venue is proper. Plaintiff does not object,this case to be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 1/13/20. (jw) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 Order for Response, to Defendants' Motion to Transfer by All Plaintiffs. (Cain, Monty) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Monty L Cain on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Cain, Monty) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Folluo, Dan) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Receipt for Money Received from Angrej Singh in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500077873 regarding #1 Notice of Removal,, (kmt) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER for Response re #3 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by EK Carriers Inc. Upon review, the Court orders Plaintiff to respond to Defendants transfer request by January 9, 2020. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/30/19. (jw) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by EK Carriers Inc. (Clark, Eric) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ; Defendant is hereby ordered to show cause for their removal within seven days of the date of this order and to demonstrate whether the action should be remanded to the District Court of Carter County, Oklahoma or transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Oklahoma. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 12/16/19. (jw) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Carter County District Court, case number CJ-2019-158 filed by EK Carriers Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2-Petition, #3 Exhibit 3-EOA J. Foshee & C. Foshee, #4 Exhibit 4-Amended Notice of Publication, #5 Exhibit 5-Affidavit for Service by Publication, #6 Exhibit 6-Summons Issued to Removing Defendant, #7 Exhibit 7-Summons Issued to Defendant Singh, #8 Exhibit 8-Notice of Filing Removal to Federal Court, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(nv) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.