This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 05:05:25 (UTC).

Hong v. Recreational Equipment Inc et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Hong filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Recreational Equipment Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is B. Lynn Winmill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00435

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

B. Lynn Winmill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tony Hong

Defendants

Samuel Krieg

Does 1-10

Recreational Equipment Inc

Samuel Krieg doing business as krieg Climbing Cycling doing business as Krieg USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joanna Ardalan

One Llp, 4000 Macarthur Blvd, East Tower Ste 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Rogelio Omar Riojas

Attorney at GOLDFARB & HUCK ROTH RIOJAS, PLLC

925 Fourth Avenue, Ste 3950

Seattle, WA 98104

Christopher M Huck

Attorney at GOLDFARB & HUCK ROTH RIOJAS, PLLC

925 Fourth Avenue, Ste 3950

Seattle, WA 98104

Ryan Thomas McFarland

Attorney at Scentsy, Inc.

P.O. Box 1335

Meridian, ID 83642

John Tehranian

One Llp, 4000 Macarthur Blvd, East Tower Suite 500

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Christopher Lee

One Llc, 9301 Wilshire Blvd Penthouse Suite

Beverly Hills, CA 90210

Defendant Attorneys

David A Kazemba

Attorney at OVERCAST LAW OFFICE, PS

23 S. Wenatchee Ave., Ste 320

Wenatchee, WA 98801

Scott David Swanson

Attorney at Shaver & Swanson, LLP

Po Box 877

Boise, ID 83701

Stephen M. Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

7538 Draper Avenue

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#27

#24

#23

3 #1

Summons

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Summons Samuel Krieg

1 #4

Summons Recreational Equipment Inc.

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Stephen M. Lobbin for Samuel Krieg and for Recreational Equipment Inc Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) SCHEDULING ORDER Telephonic scheduling conference held on 1/9/20. ( Dispositive Motions due by 9/28/2020. Amended Pleadings & Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2020. Mediation shall take place by 5/1/2020. Discovery due by 9/10/2020.). Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Stephen M. Lobbin. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1992634.)Scott David Swanson appearing for Defendants Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc. Responses due by 1/29/2020 (Swanson, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott David Swanson on behalf of Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc (Swanson, Scott)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Tony Hong. (Ardalan, Joanna)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DISCOVERY PLAN by Tony Hong . (Ardalan, Joanna)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #27 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Christopher Lee for Tony Hong Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Christopher Lee. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1985826.)Ryan Thomas McFarland appearing for Plaintiff Tony Hong. Responses due by 1/8/2020 (McFarland, Ryan)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #24 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney John Tehranian for Tony Hong Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #23 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance Joanna Ardalan Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2019, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/30/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/13/2019. (AD)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss and to Transfer Venue, filed by Defendants Does 1-10, Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel Krieg in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Transfer Venue, #2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/13/2019, (Kazemba, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Recreational Equipment Inc (Kazemba, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney David A Kazemba on behalf of Defendants Does 1-10, Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc. (Kazemba, David)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Recreational Equipment, Inc. on 6/21/2019, filed by Plaintiff Tony Hong. (Riojas, Rogelio)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Mailed to the US Copyright Office (SNP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Samuel Krieg, Recreational Equipment Inc (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SNP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • DocketJudge James L. Robart added. (SNP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5812856), filed by Tony Hong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons Recreational Equipment Inc., #5 Summons Samuel Krieg, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Riojas, Rogelio)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RECREATIONAL EQUIPMENT, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott D. Swanson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M. Lobbin