This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 13:22:33 (UTC).

Honeycutt v. LCF, Inc

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 Honeycutt filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against LCF, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00206

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly A Brady

Referral Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joyce Honeycutt

Defendant

LCF Inc doing business as Brandy's Gentlemen's Club

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel K Stein

Attorney at Lynn and Stein PC

102 S Wabash St

Wabash, IN 46992

Defendant Attorneys

James J O'Connor

Attorney at Barrett McNagny LLP

215 E Berry St, Po Box 2263

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Taliesin P Anglin

Attorney at Barrett McNagny LLP

215 E Berry St, Po Box 2263

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Rachel K Steinhofer

Attorney at Barrett McNagny LLP

215 E Berry St, Po Box 2263

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons Summons

#2

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Answer due 7/19/2019 per DE #6 (jld) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Taliesin P Anglin on behalf of LCF Inc (Anglin, Taliesin) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel K Steinhofer on behalf of LCF Inc (Steinhofer, Rachel) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by LCF Inc ; answer due by July 19, 2019. (O'Connor, James) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James J O'Connor on behalf of LCF Inc (O'Connor, James) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to DE #4 LCT Inc answer due 6/21/2019 (nae) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed May 31, 2019 Acknowledgement filed by Joyce Honeycutt. (Stein, Joel) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to LCF Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketJudge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (sct) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Joel K Stein on behalf of Joyce Honeycutt (Stein, Joel) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT against LCF, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3888062.), filed by Joyce Honeycutt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons)(Stein, Joel) Modified on 5/10/2019 edit dft(sct). (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LCF, Inc. d/b/a Brandy's Gentlemen's Club is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rachel K Steinhofer(Designation Retained)