This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 09:48:41 (UTC).

Homesite Insurance Company v. Acer American Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Homesite Insurance Company filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Acer American Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David N. Hurd and Andrew T. Baxter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01071

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David N. Hurd

Referral Judge

Andrew T. Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Homesite Insurance Company

Defendant

Acer American Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fredric P. Gallin

Attorney at Methfessel & Werbel

112 West 34Th Street, 17Th Floor

New York, NY 10120

Defendant Attorney

Tony R. Sears

Attorney at Ward Greenberg Heller & Reidy LLP

1800 Bausch & Lomb Place

Rochester, NY 14604-2713

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STIPULATION and OrderExtending Time for defendant to Respond to Complaint by Homesite Insurance Company submitted to Judge Baxter. (Gallin, Fredric) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Tony R. Sears on behalf of Acer American Corporation (Sears, Tony) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1 Statement, Filing Order, Lawyers Referral List served on Acer America Corporation on 10/01/2020, filed by Homesite Insurance Company. (Gallin, Fredric) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Homesite Insurance Company for service of Complaint on defendant, Acer America Corporation (Gallin, Fredric) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

#4

(#4) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Rule 16 Conference set for 12/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Acer American Corporation. (kmp) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#2

(#2) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Homesite Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate American Family Insurance for Homesite Insurance Company. (kmp) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Acer American Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5235481) filed by Homesite Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER: The time for Acer American Corporation to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 11/20/2020. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/29/2020. (nmk) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION and OrderExtending Time for defendant to Respond to Complaint by Homesite Insurance Company submitted to Judge Baxter. (Gallin, Fredric) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Tony R. Sears on behalf of Acer American Corporation (Sears, Tony) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER: On 10/27/2020, plaintiff filed proof of service asserting that the summons and complaint were served upon the defendant on 10/1/2020. The time for defendant to file an answer or otherwise move has expired. Pursuant to Local Rule 55.1, plaintiff may request a clerk's entry of default or, in the alternative, plaintiff is directed to file a status report by 11/4/2020. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 10/28/2020. (nmk) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1 Statement, Filing Order, Lawyers Referral List served on Acer America Corporation on 10/01/2020, filed by Homesite Insurance Company. (Gallin, Fredric) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Homesite Insurance Company for service of Complaint on defendant, Acer America Corporation (Gallin, Fredric) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Rule 16 Conference set for 12/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/2/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (kmp) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Acer American Corporation. (kmp) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Homesite Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate American Family Insurance for Homesite Insurance Company. (kmp) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Acer American Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5235481) filed by Homesite Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kmp) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less