This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/27/2020 at 08:15:23 (UTC).

Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest v. Hoverzon, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2020 Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Hoverzon, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric C. Tostrud and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00617

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric C. Tostrud

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest

Defendant

Swagway, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George J Matz

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert A. Stutman, P.C.

500 Office Center Drive, Ste 301, Pennsylvania

Fort Washington, PA 19034

Michelle D Hurley

Attorney at Yost & Baill, LLP

220 S 6Th St Ste 2050

Mpls, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#6

6 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

#8

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. Swagway, LLC waiver sent on 3/26/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Hurley, Michelle) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Swagway, LLC. (MMP) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Swagway, LLC. filed by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hurley, Michelle) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney George J Matz for Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 3/12/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney George J. Matz. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7553046 filed by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Hurley, Michelle) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Hoverzon, LLC, Swagway, LLC. (CLK) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Eric C. Tostrud per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-617 ECT/KMM. (CLK) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7516251) filed by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hurley, Michelle) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less