This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2019 at 07:22:48 (UTC).

Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest v. Hoverson LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Hoverson LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David T. Schultz and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-01708

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest

Defendants

Swagway, LLC

Hoverzon, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James T Hanvik

Attorney at Bassford Hanvik PLLC

4601 Excelsior Blvd., Suite 500

Minneapolis, MN 55416

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

#5

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Hoverzon, LLC, Swagway, LLC. (kt) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. filed by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. Filer requests summons issued. (Hanvik, James) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 7/9/2019. (KAR) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Hoverzon, LLC, Swagway, LLC. (kt) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • Docket(#3) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 19-cv-1708 SRN/DTS. (kt) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR: complaint (filing fee $ 47, receipt number AMNDC-6965682). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hanvik, James) Modified text on 6/28/2019 (kt). (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6965553) filed by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. Filer requests summons issued. (Hanvik, James) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less