This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/18/2021 at 09:15:05 (UTC).

Holuby et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 Holuby filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F Heil, III, Gregory K Frizzell and Susan E Huntsman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00296

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Susan E Huntsman

Presiding Judges

John F Heil, III

Gregory K Frizzell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ronald Holuby

Deborah Holuby

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

A Laurie Koller

Attorney at Koller Trial Law

2504 E 21St St, Suite B

Tulsa, OK 74114-1759

Ben D Baker

Attorney at Red Dirt Legal, PLLC

201 North Broadway Street, Suite 111

Moore, OK 73160

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Lynn Dickerson

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (Tulsa)

Two W Second St Ste 1100

Tulsa, OK 74103

William J. Holland

Attorney at McAfee & Taft

100 W. 2Nd St., Suite 1100, Williams Center Tower Ii

Tulsa, ST 1100

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#12

#11

#10

#8

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #4

Exhibit 4 - Docket Sheet

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Service of Process

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Petition

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Change of Address by Ben D Baker by on behalf of Deborah Holuby, Ronald Holuby (Baker, Ben) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 4/15/2022, Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2022, Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2022 at 02:30 PM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/25/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell, Jury Trial set for 8/15/2022 at 09:30 AM before Judge Gregory K Frizzell) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) JOINT STATUS REPORT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell The Court has a significant number of criminal cases awaiting trial due to the COVID-19 pandemic and the decision of the Supreme Court in McGirt v. United States, 140 S. Ct. 2452 (2020). Criminal cases must be tried before civil cases, and civil cases will most likely not be tried by a district judge unless and until all criminal cases on a monthly trial docket have been resolved or continued. Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, the parties in a civil case may consent to a trial before a magistrate judge, and this option is available for civil litigants who wish to have a jury trial. The AO-85 consent forms are available on the U.S. District Court website. However, the parties are free to withhold consent to a trial before a magistrate judge without any adverse consequences, and the parties are reminded of this option only as a possible means of expediting a civil trial in cases in which the parties desire to expedite the final resolution of their case. The parties may also request an additional settlement conference at any time. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lah, Chambers) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER by Judge Gregory K Frizzell , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 8/24/2021) (kjp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER with Jury Demand (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ben D Baker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baker, Ben) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Due to Court conflict, recusing Chief Judge John F Heil, III. Judge Gregory K Frizzell reassigned to case., changing case number to 21-CV-296-GKF-SH (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by A Laurie Koller on behalf of All Plaintiffs [Note: Attorney A Laurie Koller added to party Deborah Holuby(pty:pla), Attorney A Laurie Koller added to party Ronald Holuby(pty:pla).] (Koller, A) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (ll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William J. Holland on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney William J. Holland added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Holland, William) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn Dickerson on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2021-1782 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2446572) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (With attachments) (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company by Ronald Holuby, Deborah Holuby (ll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William J. Holland

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica L Dickerson