This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2023 at 09:15:55 (UTC).

Holtz v. Central Bancompany, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Holtz filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Central Bancompany, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Audrey G. Fleissig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:23-CV-00029

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Audrey G. Fleissig

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Holtz

Defendants

Central Bancompany, Inc.

238 Madison Street

Jefferson City, MO 65101

Cenlar Bank FSB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard A. Voytas, Jr.

Attorney at VOYTAS LAW LLC

7321 S. Lindbergh Boulevard, Suite 400

St. Louis, MO 63125

Defendant Attorneys

Michael P. Stephens

Attorney at JENKINS AND KLING PC

150 N. Meramec Avenue, Suite 400

St. Louis, MO 63105

Nicole Elizabeth Gorovsky

Attorney at JENKINS AND KLING PC

150 N. Meramec Avenue, Suite 400

St. Louis, MO 63105

Caleb J. Halberg

Attorney at DYKEMA GOSSETT - Chicago

10 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 2300

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts I-III of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Defendant Central Bancompany, Inc.. (Gorovsky, Nicole) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#35

(#35) MOTION to Dismiss :Counts I-III of Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant Central Bancompany, Inc.. (Gorovsky, Nicole) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

#34

(#34) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. (See Full Order.) This case is assigned to Track: 2 - Standard. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/4/2023. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/11/2023 02:30 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/6/2023. (CBL) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#33

(#33) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Cenlar Bank FSB, Central Bancompany, Inc. Amendment to #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Robert Holtz. (CBL) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

#29

(#29) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss :MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I-III OF PLAINTIFFS PETITION by Plaintiff Robert Holtz. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#27

(#27) First MOTION to Stay Briefing on Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiff Robert Holtz. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

#25

(#32) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend is GRANTED. ECF No. #23 . The Clerk of Court shall (1) detach and file ECF No. 23-1 as Plaintiff's first amended complaint, (2) dismiss CitiMortgage, Inc. as a Defendant in this case, and correct the name of Defendant Cenlar Agency, Inc. to Cenlar Bank FSB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motions to dismiss directed to Plaintiff's original complaint, and the motions to stay and extend briefing on those motions to dismiss, are all DISMISSED without prejudice, as moot. ECF Nos. #6 , #21 , #25 , #27 , #29 & #30 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/6/2023. (CBL) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

23 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

(#33) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Cenlar Bank FSB, Central Bancompany, Inc. Amendment to #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Robert Holtz. (CBL) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

1 #8

Attachment Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Notice of Removal

1 #7

Attachment Consent to Removal by Cenlar Agency

1 #6

Attachment Consent to Removal by Central Bancompany

1 #5

Attachment Disclosure of Organizational Interests

1 #4

Original Filing Form original filing form

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit Docket Sheet & State Court documents

1 #1

Exhibit Summons and State Court Petition

1 #1

Main Document

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #35 MOTION to Dismiss :Counts I-III of Plaintiff's Petition filed by Defendant Central Bancompany, Inc.. (Gorovsky, Nicole) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION to Dismiss :Counts I-III of Plaintiff's Petition by Defendant Central Bancompany, Inc.. (Gorovsky, Nicole) (Entered: 03/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. (See Full Order.) This case is assigned to Track: 2 - Standard. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/4/2023. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/11/2023 02:30 PM in Zoom Video Conference before District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/6/2023. (CBL) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Cenlar Bank FSB, Central Bancompany, Inc. Amendment to #5 Petition (Removal/Transfer) filed by Robert Holtz. (CBL) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to amend is GRANTED. ECF No. #23 . The Clerk of Court shall (1) detach and file ECF No. 23-1 as Plaintiff's first amended complaint, (2) dismiss CitiMortgage, Inc. as a Defendant in this case, and correct the name of Defendant Cenlar Agency, Inc. to Cenlar Bank FSB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motions to dismiss directed to Plaintiff's original complaint, and the motions to stay and extend briefing on those motions to dismiss, are all DISMISSED without prejudice, as moot. ECF Nos. #6 , #21 , #25 , #27 , #29 & #30 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/6/2023. (CBL) (Entered: 03/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) RESPONSE to Motion re #27 First MOTION to Stay Briefing on Motions to Dismiss filed by Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Ford, Benjamin) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff Robert Holtz. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss :MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I-III OF PLAINTIFFS PETITION by Plaintiff Robert Holtz. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Cenlar Agency, Inc.. (Halberg, Caleb) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) First MOTION to Stay Briefing on Motions to Dismiss by Plaintiff Robert Holtz. (Voytas, Richard) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket***REMARK ***CLERKS NOTE: THIS REMARK WAS ENTERED IN THIS CASE IN ERROR. NEF regenerated to all parties. (JBH) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCase Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within 10 days of the filing of the first pleading or entry of appearance # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • Docket***REMARK Defendant Attorney for CitiMortgage, Inc. was notified via email and directed to re-file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests form on 1/10/2023. As of 1/11/2023 at 8:40AM there has been no response. Case will proceed with Judge assignment and case opening. (JBH) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss :MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I-III OF PLAINTIFFS PETITION filed by Defendant Central Bancompany, Inc.. (JBH) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTS I-III OF PLAINTIFFS PETITION by Defendant Central Bancompany, Inc. (JBH) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Robert Holtz.(JBH) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (JBH) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 File-Stamped Notice of Removal Filed in State Court, #3 Proof of Service)(Ford, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Benjamin Ford for Defendant CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Ford, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County, case number 22SL-CC-5102, with receipt number AMOEDC-9712335, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by CitiMortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and State Court Petition, #2 Exhibit Docket Sheet & State Court documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #4 Original Filing Form original filing form, #5 Attachment Disclosure of Organizational Interests, #6 Attachment Consent to Removal by Central Bancompany, #7 Attachment Consent to Removal by Cenlar Agency, #8 Attachment Notice to Plaintiff of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Bakewell, Ketrina) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less