This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2020 at 08:13:33 (UTC).

Holt v. Southeast Restaurant Group-Main, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 Holt filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Southeast Restaurant Group-Main, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Morgan Holt

Defendant

Southeast Restaurant Group-Main, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David W. Garrison

Attorney at Barrett Johnston Martin & Garrison, LLC

414 Union Street, Suite 900

Nashville, TN 37219

Joshua A. Frank

Attorney at Barrett Johnston Martin & Garrison, LLC

414 Union Street, Suite 900

Nashville, TN 37219

Defendant Attorneys

Jerome D. Pinn

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones, PLLC (Knoxville)

550 Main Avenue, Suite 900, P O Box 2231

Knoxville, TN 37902-2231

Edward H. Trent

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones, PLLC (Knoxville)

550 Main Avenue, Suite 900, P O Box 2231

Knoxville, TN 37902-2231

Fredrick J. Bissinger

Attorney at Wimberly, Lawson, Wright, Daves & Jones, PLLC (Nashville)

214 Second Avenue, N, Suite 3

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#25

#24

#23

#22

21 #1

Attachment Entity Information and Certificate of Service

#21

20 #1

Attachment Entity Information and Certificate of Service

#20

#19

7 #1

Exhibit A - Consent Forms

#7

6 #1

Exhibit A - Consent Forms

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger: Case Management Conference by Telephone held on 4/17/2020. (Hearing lasted :15)(kb) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL: Jury Trial set for 7/27/2021 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 873 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Pretrial Conference set for 7/23/2021 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/20/2021; Exhibit List due by 7/20/2021; and Witness List due by 7/20/2021. Lead counsel for each party must attend the pretrial conference. If lead counsel is not from Tennessee, local counsel must also attend. If the case settles closer to trial than two business days, the cost of summoning the jury may be assessed against the parties. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2020; Discovery due by 1/15/2021; and Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2021. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/17/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [PROPOSED] INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Morgan Holt. (Garrison, David) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER: Because Thursday is Judge Trauger's day to hold video conferences in criminal matters, it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for April 16, 2020 is hereby RESET for Friday, April 17, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. The initial case management conference will be held telephonically. Lead counsel for each party shall participate in the conference. Judge Trauger's Courtroom Deputy will email to counsel the number they need to call in order to participate in the conference. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 4/10/2020. (mg) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Edward H. Trent. (mg) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Southeast Restaurant Group-Main, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Entity Information and Certificate of Service)(Bissinger, Fredrick) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Southeast Restaurant Group-Main, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Entity Information and Certificate of Service)(Bissinger, Fredrick) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Defendants' ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Southeast Restaurant Group-Main, LLC.(Bissinger, Fredrick) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward H. Trent on behalf of All Defendants (Trent, Edward) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Fredrick J. Bissinger on behalf of Southeast Restaurant Group-Main, LLC (Bissinger, Fredrick) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Morgan Holt. Southeast Restaurant Group-Main, LLC served on 2/24/2020. (Frank, Joshua) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Morgan Holt Notice of Filing Notices of Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms)(Frank, Joshua) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Morgan Holt Notice of Filing Notices of Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent Forms)(Frank, Joshua) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 2:00 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons issued as to Southeast Restaurant Group-Main, LLC. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (mg) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for David W. Garrison, and Joshua A. Frank. (mg) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Southeast Restaurant Group-Main, LLC (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-3090970), filed by Morgan Holt. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(mg) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua A. Frank