This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/05/2020 at 08:13:23 (UTC).

Holt v. Otis Elevator Company

Case Summary

On 03/06/2020 Holt filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Otis Elevator Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David A. Ruiz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00521

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David A. Ruiz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edwin Holt

Defendant

Otis Elevator Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathleen R. Harris

Attorney at Law Office of Charles E. Boyk

405 Madison Avenue

Toledo, OH 43604

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph A. Manno

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Seth H. Wamelink

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

Thomas W. Baker

Attorney at Tucker Ellis - Cleveland

950 Main Avenue

Cleveland, OH 44113

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 5/29/2020. Telephone Status Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. Conferencing instructions to be emailed to counsel. Plaintiff's expert report(s) due by 11/2/2020. Defendants' expert report(s) due by 1/4/2021. Close of discovery on liability due by 2/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2021. Close of discovery regarding damages due by 5/3/2021. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 4/16/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#11

(#11) Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. Case Management Conference held on 4/16/2020. The court established a case management schedule as reflected in a separate order to be issued. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 30 minutes. (G,CA) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

#10

(#10) Joint Motion to Excuse the Presence of Parties at the Telephonic Case Management Conference filed by Defendant Otis Elevator Company. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#9

(#9) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#8

(#8) Initial Disclosures filed by Edwin Holt. (Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#7

(#7) Initial Disclosures filed by Otis Elevator Company. (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#6

(#6) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 4/16/2020 at 01:00 PM at Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 4/14/2020. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/13/2020. (K,K) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#5

(#5) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Otis Elevator Company. (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#4

(#4) Certified copy of state court documents received from the Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas. (J,FE) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#3

(#3) Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Otis Elevator Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Otis Elevator Company filed by Otis Elevator Company. (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint and Docket of Proceedings

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV 20 928910 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400, receipt number AOHNDC-9844214. Filed by Otis Elevator Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Docket of Proceedings) (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 5/29/2020. Telephone Status Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. Conferencing instructions to be emailed to counsel. Plaintiff's expert report(s) due by 11/2/2020. Defendants' expert report(s) due by 1/4/2021. Close of discovery on liability due by 2/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/1/2021. Close of discovery regarding damages due by 5/3/2021. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 4/16/2020. (G,CA) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. Case Management Conference held on 4/16/2020. The court established a case management schedule as reflected in a separate order to be issued. (Court Reporter: n/a.) Time: 30 minutes. (G,CA) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder [non-document] granting Joint #10 Motion to Excuse the Presence of Parties at the Telephonic Case Management Conference. The named parties and party representatives shall be available by telephone should the Court require their presence during the CMC. Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz on 4/14/2020.(G,CA) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case, pursuant to consent. Judge Dan Aaron Polster terminated. (Y,A) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder and Consent [non-document] of the parties to this case being transferred to the docket of Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz for further proceedings (Related Document #9 ). Case Management Conference to be held on 4/16/2020 at 01:00 PM* telephonically before Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. Conferencing instructions will be emailed to counsel. (*Please note change in TIME only.) Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/14/2020. (K,K) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint Motion to Excuse the Presence of Parties at the Telephonic Case Management Conference filed by Defendant Otis Elevator Company. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Initial Disclosures filed by Edwin Holt. (Harris, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Initial Disclosures filed by Otis Elevator Company. (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNotice [non-document] Case Management Conference to be held telephonically on 4/16/2020 at 01:15 PM* before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Call in instructions to be provided separately. Parties are directed to use landlines whenever possible. (*Please note change in TIME only.) (K,K) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 4/16/2020 at 01:00 PM at Chambers 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 4/14/2020. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/13/2020. (K,K) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Answer to Complaint with Jury Demand (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Otis Elevator Company. (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certified copy of state court documents received from the Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas. (J,FE) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Supplement to Notice of Removal, - Civil Cover Sheet, filed by Otis Elevator Company. Related document(s) #1 . (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketJudge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation for Otis Elevator Company filed by Otis Elevator Company. (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Common Pleas Court, case number CV 20 928910 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $400, receipt number AOHNDC-9844214. Filed by Otis Elevator Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Docket of Proceedings) (Manno, Joseph) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Otis Elevator Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas W. Baker(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph A. Manno

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth H. Wamelink