This case was last updated from PACER on 08/20/2019 at 08:03:49 (UTC).

Holt v. Dormakaba USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/21/2019 Holt filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Dormakaba USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Danny C. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00257

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Danny C. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roselena Holt

Defendant

Dormakaba USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Linda B. Sullivan

Attorney at Leahy & Leahy PLLC

378 Village Street

Penacook, NH 03303

Defendant Attorneys

Jacinta F. Porter

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Louisville

400 W. Market Street, Suite 3200

Louisville, KY 40202

Janine Tate Webb

Attorney at Frost Brown Todd LLC - Lexington

250 W. Main Street, 2800 Lexington Financial Center

Lexington, KY 40507-1749

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

State Court Record

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

5 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#6

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: 1) All schedules and deadlines are CANCELED. 2) The parties are directed to tender a proposed agreed order of dismissal within 30 days. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 08/06/2019. (MDC) cc: COR (Entered: 08/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Settlement by Dormakaba USA, Inc. (Porter, Jacinta) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1. NLT 30 days, counsel shall meet required by Rule 26(f). 2. At the meeting, parties shall exchange required disclosures. 3. NLT 10 after the meeting, counsel shall file a written joint report. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(JJ)cc: COR (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: #1 Notice of Removal (SLH) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • Conflict Check run. (SLH) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Dormakaba USA, Inc..(SLH) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dormakaba USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Kaba U.S. Holding Ltd., Corporate Parent Dormakaba Schweiz AG, Corporate Parent Dormakaba International Holding AG for Dormakaba USA, Inc... (SLH) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fayette Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-1853. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4392839), filed by Dormakaba USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(SLH) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DORMA USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacinta F. Porter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Janine Tate Webb