This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/16/2020 at 10:42:18 (UTC).

HOLT v. COLORADO RIVER INDIAN TRIBES et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2020 HOLT filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against COLORADO RIVER INDIAN TRIBES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01042

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOE KENNETH HOLT, JR.

Defendants

COLORADO RIVER INDIAN TRIBES

PASQUALE ANTHONY CIPOLLONE

GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY

NUMEROUS OTHER INDIAN TRIBES ACROSS THE WORLD

PRESIDENTIAL DONALD JOHN TRUMP

NATIONAL BANK OF ARIZONA

JESSICA KONG LUI

PRIMERICA FINANCIAL SERVICES

WILLIAM PELHAM BARR

NAVAJO NATION INDIAN TRIBE

VICE PRESIDENT MICHAEL RICHARD PENCE

RUDOLPH WILLIAM LOUIS GIULIANI

FORT MCDOWELL INDIAN TRIBE

BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS AND OFFICE OF THE SPECIAL TRUSTEE FOR AMERICAN INDIANS

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisORDERED that the complaint #1 and this case are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff may refile the complaint with the $400 filing fee applicable to civil actions Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 4/28/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOE KENNETH HOLT (adh, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ATTORNEY JESSICA KONG LUI, ATTORNEY PASQUALE ANTHONY CIPOLLONE, ATTORNEY RUDOLPH WILLIAM LOUIS GIULIANI, ATTORNEY WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, BUREAU OF INDIAN AFFAIRS AND OFFICE OF THE SPECIAL TRUSTEE FOR AMERICAN INDIANS, COLORADO RIVER INDIAN TRIBES, FORT MCDOWELL INDIAN TRIBE, GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY, NATIONAL BANK OF ARIZONA, NAVAJO NATION INDIAN TRIBE, NUMEROUS OTHER INDIAN TRIBES ACROSS THE WORLD, PRESIDENTIAL DONALD JOHN TRUMP, PRIMERICA FINANCIAL SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, VICE PRESIDENT MICHAEL RICHARD PENCE with Jury Demand filed by JOE KENNETH HOLT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketInitiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 4/17/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Primerica Financial Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GILA RIVER INDIAN COMMUNITY is a litigant

Latest cases where National Bank of Arizona, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant