This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/13/2020 at 10:40:16 (UTC).

Holt et al v. Pony Express Trucking, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Holt filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Pony Express Trucking, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-06116

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Derek W. Holt

Lindy Holt

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Pony Express Trucking, Inc.

Matt Grooms doing business as Grooms Concrete

Ryan Andrew Eckstein

Herzog Contracting Corp.

Grooms & Egbert Hauling, LLC

Matt Grooms

Defendant and Cross Claimant

Herzog Contracting Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth E Siemens

Laurna Alumbaugh

Michael L. Taylor

Benjamin S. Creedy

Lindsey Brooke Holcumbrink

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Lee M. Baty

Tim Eugene Dollar

James S. Kreamer

Angela M. Higgins

Thomas Hershewe

Andrew Joseph Liles

Jeffrey B. Davison

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorney

Andrew Joseph Liles

 

Court Documents

#42

#41

#40

#39

#38

#37

#36

#35

#25

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) SUGGESTIONS in support re #25 MOTION to stay Deadlines filed by Lee M. Baty on behalf of Defendant Pony Express Trucking, Inc.. (Related document(s) #25 ) (Baty, Lee) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2021. Status Report due by 8/16/2021. Trial to be set by future order. Please see text of order for additional deadlines. Signed on 10/2/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Diefenbach, Tracy) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Lee M. Baty on behalf of Defendant Pony Express Trucking, Inc..(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Ryan Andrew Eckstein, Matt Grooms, Grooms & Egbert Hauling, LLC, Herzog Contracting Corp., Lindy Holt, Derek W. Holt. (Creedy, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Andrew Joseph Liles on behalf of Defendant Herzog Contracting Corp..(Liles, Andrew) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Lee M. Baty on behalf of Defendant Pony Express Trucking, Inc..(Baty, Lee) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Andrew Joseph Liles on behalf of Defendant Herzog Contracting Corp..(Liles, Andrew) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Angela M. Higgins on behalf of Defendants Ryan Andrew Eckstein, Matt Grooms, Grooms & Egbert Hauling, LLC.(Higgins, Angela) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Benjamin S. Creedy on behalf of Plaintiffs Lindy Holt, Derek W. Holt.(Creedy, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION for leave to file Notice of Supplemental Authority filed by Benjamin S. Creedy on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/13/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Creedy, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Bradley L. Akins terminated as counsel for Ryan Andrew Eckstein. Signed on 08/19/2020 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Powers, Jo) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Brette S. Hart terminated as counsel for Ryan Andrew Eckstein. Signed on 08/19/2020 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Powers, Jo) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Bradley L. Akins on behalf of Ryan Andrew Eckstein. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Akins, Bradley) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Brette S. Hart on behalf of Ryan Andrew Eckstein. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/1/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Hart, Brette) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (First Amended Petition) on behalf of Ryan Andrew Eckstein, Matt Grooms, Grooms & Egbert Hauling, LLC.(Dollar, Tim) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of appearance by Tim Eugene Dollar on behalf of Ryan Andrew Eckstein, Matt Grooms, Grooms & Egbert Hauling, LLC (Attorney Tim Eugene Dollar added to party Ryan Andrew Eckstein(pty:dft), Attorney Tim Eugene Dollar added to party Matt Grooms(pty:dft), Attorney Tim Eugene Dollar added to party Grooms & Egbert Hauling, LLC(pty:dft))(Dollar, Tim) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of appearance by Thomas Hershewe on behalf of Ryan Andrew Eckstein, Matt Grooms, Grooms & Egbert Hauling, LLC (Attorney Thomas Hershewe added to party Ryan Andrew Eckstein(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hershewe added to party Matt Grooms(pty:dft), Attorney Thomas Hershewe added to party Grooms & Egbert Hauling, LLC(pty:dft))(Hershewe, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 8/17/20 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Andrew County County, case number 19AW-CC00220, filed by Lee M. Baty on behalf of Pony Express Trucking, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6995293. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H - Civil Cover Sheet)(Baty, Lee) . (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less