This case was last updated from PACER on 01/29/2021 at 09:35:39 (UTC).

Holston v. English et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2020 Holston filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against English. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lisette M. Reid and Aileen M. Cannon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-14421

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lisette M. Reid

Presiding Judge

Aileen M. Cannon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reginal L. Holston

Punta Gorda, FL 33955

Defendants

Sergeant Sellers

Nurse Romulus

A. Eschevarria

J. Cruzado

Ricky Dixon

D. Rembert

Mark Harriss

D. Brown

L. Dugan-McClure

Captain Wells

Ryan English

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Centurion of Florida

Inspector Baty

Sergeant Acosta

Lars Severson

Trinity Food Services, Inc.

E. Ortiz

H. N. Bhadja

S. Siegler

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Shane Weaver

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1515 N. Flagler Dr., Suite 900

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) MOTION to Strike Unnotarized Exhibit by Reginal L. Holston. Responses due by 2/11/2021 (amb) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#25

(#25) Defendant's RESPONSE to #17 Notice (Other) by Ryan English. (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#24

(#24) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Report and Recommendation. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is no longer assigned as referral judge in this case. This matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for a ruling on all pretrial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), (C). Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (ad00) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#23

(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion MOTION to Strike MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ryan English. Replies due by 1/29/2021. (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

#18

(#18) PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS MOTION to Strike ( Responses due by 1/28/2021), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, MOTION to Remand to State Court by Reginal L. Holston. (amb) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

17 #1

Exhibit

#17

(#25) Defendant's RESPONSE to #17 Notice (Other) by Ryan English. (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#15

(#18) PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS MOTION to Strike ( Responses due by 1/28/2021), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, MOTION to Remand to State Court by Reginal L. Holston. (amb) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#11

(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Direct Defense to provide cited unpublished authorities to Plaintiff filed by Ryan English. Replies due by 1/21/2021. (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

#10

(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Strike #10 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order Against Discovery Until Complaint Can be Screened filed by Ryan English. Replies due by 1/26/2021. (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Defendants shall file their response on or before January 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 12/23/2020. (AMC) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#7

(#7) Defendant's MOTION for Screening of Complaint Pursuant to PLRA , Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint Until After Screening by Ryan English. (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#6

(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ryan English. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

5 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Ryan English re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

1 #1

State Court Complaint with Exhibits

#1

(#5) NOTICE by Ryan English re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY (See DE #26 for Image) to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Direct Defense to provide cited unpublished authorities to Plaintiff filed by Reginal L. Holston. (amb) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION to Strike Unnotarized Exhibit by Reginal L. Holston. Responses due by 2/11/2021 (amb) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Defendant's RESPONSE to #17 Notice (Other) by Ryan English. (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for Report and Recommendation. Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard is no longer assigned as referral judge in this case. This matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid for a ruling on all pretrial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), (C). Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (ad00) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion MOTION to Strike MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ryan English. Replies due by 1/29/2021. (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) (VACATED) ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shaniek M. Maynard for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 1/20/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb) Modified text on 1/26/2021 (mno). SEE #24 (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Strike #10 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order Against Discovery Until Complaint Can be Screened filed by Ryan English. Replies due by 1/26/2021. (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION in Opposition to Defense Motion to Stay Discovery MOTION to Produce filed by Ryan English. Replies due by 1/26/2021. (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Direct Defense to provide cited unpublished authorities to Plaintiff filed by Ryan English. Replies due by 1/21/2021. (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) PLAINTIFF'S OMNIBUS MOTION to Strike ( Responses due by 1/28/2021), MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #15 Response in Opposition to Motion, MOTION to Remand to State Court by Reginal L. Holston. (amb) (Entered: 01/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's Time Sensitive MOTION for Protective Order Against Discovery Until Complaint Can be Screened by Ryan English. (Weaver, Shane) Modified text on 12/28/2020 (jbs). (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand. Defendants shall file their response on or before January 4, 2021. Signed by Judge Aileen M. Cannon on 12/23/2020. (AMC) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Ryan English. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's MOTION for Screening of Complaint Pursuant to PLRA , Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer to Complaint Until After Screening by Ryan English. (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Post-Removal Remand to State Court by Reginal L. Holston. (amb) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Ryan English re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Weaver, Shane) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the State Court Complaint wit Exhibits. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (drz) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to District Judge Aileen M. Cannon. (drz) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Holston v. Harriss, et al.) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13948533, filed by Ryan English.(Weaver, Shane) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/1/2020) (drz). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/1/2020: #1 State Court Complaint with Exhibits) (drz). Modified on 12/1/2020 (drz). (No Answer, Affirmative Defenses or Motion to Dismiss in State Court) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Centurion of Florida is a litigant