This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2022 at 09:09:25 (UTC).

Holston-Toth v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/06/2022 Holston-Toth filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kandis A. Westmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-05806

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kandis A. Westmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Courtney Holston-Toth

Defendant

Metropolitan Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Susan D. Pelmulder

Defendant Attorney

Ronald K. Alberts

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Pelmulder, Susan) (Filed on 10/6/2022) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#3

(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Courtney Holston-Toth Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Courtney Holston-Toth (mbc, COURT STAFF)(Filed on 10/6/2022). (Pelmulder, Susan) (Filed on 10/6/2022) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2022) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2022) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courtney Holston-Toth. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Pelmulder, Susan) (Filed on 10/18/2022) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Courtney Holston-Toth.. (Pelmulder, Susan) (Filed on 10/20/2022) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Defendant's Time to Respond filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Alberts, Ronald) (Filed on 10/25/2022) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#10

(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/8/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2022) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#11

(#11) SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2022. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2022) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#12

(#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (Alberts, Ronald) (Filed on 11/9/2022) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#13

(#13) Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company ANSWER to Complaint byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Alberts, Ronald) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#14

(#14) ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metro Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Susannette Burroughs, Other Affiliate Salesforce.com, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Alberts, Ronald) (Filed on 11/21/2022) Modified on 11/22/2022 (far, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

#15

(#15) Certificate of Interested Entities by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Courtney Holston-Toth for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Alberts, Ronald) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) Certificate of Interested Entities by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Courtney Holston-Toth for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Alberts, Ronald) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #15 Certificate of Interested Entities by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Metro Life Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Susannette Burroughs, Other Affiliate Salesforce.com, Inc. for Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Alberts, Ronald) (Filed on 11/21/2022) Modified on 11/22/2022 (far, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/21/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company ANSWER to Complaint byMetropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Alberts, Ronald) (Filed on 11/21/2022) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company.. (Alberts, Ronald) (Filed on 11/9/2022) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/09/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/23/2022. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2022) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 11/8/2022. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2022) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/25/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Extending Defendant's Time to Respond filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Alberts, Ronald) (Filed on 10/25/2022) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Courtney Holston-Toth.. (Pelmulder, Susan) (Filed on 10/20/2022) (Entered: 10/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Courtney Holston-Toth. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Pelmulder, Susan) (Filed on 10/18/2022) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2022) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/07/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2022) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022

Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/20/2022. (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2022) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Courtney Holston-Toth Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Courtney Holston-Toth (mbc, COURT STAFF)(Filed on 10/6/2022). (Pelmulder, Susan) (Filed on 10/6/2022) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket#Electronic filing error. Please resubmit Civil Cover Sheet. Use October 2020 form which can be downloaded from https://cand.uscourts.gov/. No judge assignment will be made until t he document is e-filed. Submit your document using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover Sheet Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Courtney Holston-Toth (mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2022) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Pelmulder, Susan) (Filed on 10/6/2022) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/06/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages (19 USC 1132(a)(1)(B)) against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17602662.). Filed byCourtney Holston-Toth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pelmulder, Susan) (Filed on 10/6/2022) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less