This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2020 at 11:47:47 (UTC).

Hologic, Inc. et al v. Minerva Surgical, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/08/2020 Hologic, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Minerva Surgical, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Sherry R. Fallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00925

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Sherry R. Fallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC

Hologic, Inc.

Defendant

Minerva Surgical, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Pilar Gabrielle Kraman

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Karen L. Pascale

Attorney at Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP

1000 North King Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

Ryan J. Casamiquela

Assad Rajani

William O. Young, Jr.

Defendant Attorney

Ian Robert Liston

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati PC

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Assad Rajani,Ryan J. Casamiquela,William O. Young, Jr for Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC, and for Hologic, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (sam) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED- re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William Young, Jr., Ryan Casamiquela, and Assad Rajani. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 9/2/2020. (lih) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney William Young, Jr., Ryan Casamiquela, and Assad Rajani - filed by Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC, Hologic, Inc.. Motions referred to Sherry R. Fallon.(Pascale, Karen) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Minerva Surgical, Inc..(Liston, Ian) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • Docket(#9) ORAL ORDER Pursuant to the filing of this case, the Court issues the following order: Magistrate Judge Fallon shall issue a scheduling order when appropriate. Magistrate Judge Fallon shall handle all nondispositive matters on all issues, except for Daubert motions, Markman hearings, and pretrial motions in limine. The parties have the right to file an appeal of the magistrate judge's order, and the same shall be decided by the undersigned. The magistrate judge shall likewise handle all discovery matters, scheduling, and pretrial conferences. If the parties believe the magistrate judge has a conflict of interest with this case, the parties shall so notify the Court. IT IS SO ORDERED.Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 07/21/20. (AEV) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketORAL ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) TELECONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: (1) A scheduling teleconference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for 9/22/2020 at 11:00 AM. (2) The parties are required to prepare for the teleconference by conferring on all matters under Rule 16 and D. Del. LR 16 and shall submit a proposed Scheduling Order to the Court no later than 9/17/2020. The Court's form scheduling order is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Fallon, Forms). If the parties have any suggestions or modifications to the standard Scheduling Order, they may be included in the proposed order for consideration by the Court. (3) If any disputed issue exists regarding the proposed Scheduling Order, it shall be noted therein, along with the parties proposed language on the issue for consideration by the Court. Ordered by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/20/2020. (lih) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (rjb) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORAL ORDER re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME is granted. Defendants have until August 31, 2020 to respond to the initial complaint. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 07/16/20. (AEV) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Joseph F. Bataillon of the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska (due to related cases). Please include the initials of the Judge (JFB) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to August 31, 2020 - filed by Minerva Surgical, Inc.. (Liston, Ian) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Ian Robert Liston on behalf of Minerva Surgical, Inc. (Liston, Ian) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed by Hologic, Inc., Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC. Minerva Surgical, Inc. served on 7/9/2020, answer due 7/30/2020. (Pascale, Karen) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Hologic, Inc. for Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC; Other Affiliate Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC for Hologic, Inc. filed by Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC, Hologic, Inc. (myr) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) U.S. No. 9,095,348. (myr) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Minerva Surgical, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-3047927.) - filed by Hologic, Inc., Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cytyc Surgical Products, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HOLOGIC, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian Robert Liston