This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2021 at 08:41:05 (UTC).

Holmes v. Wexford Health Sources Inc

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 Holmes filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Wexford Health Sources Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Anna M Manasco. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00683

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Anna M Manasco

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nathalie Holmes

Defendant

Wexford Health Sources Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam M Porter

Attorney at ADAM M. PORTER, LLC

2301 Morris Avenue, Suite 102

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Brice Hoisington

Attorney at WEBSTER HENRY

Two Perimeter Park South, Ste. 445 E

Birmingham, AL 35243

Philip G Piggott

Attorney at WEBSTER HENRY

Two Perimeter Park South, Ste. 445 East

Birmingham, AL 35243

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER- Certain deadlines and instructions apply as further set out within including: Joint status report due by February 7, 2022, A Status Conference is set for Monday February 14, 2022 at 11:00 am by zoom, Discovery due 2/25/22, Dispositive Motions due 3/28/22, Trial ready September 2022. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/21/21. (MRR, ) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Porter, Adam) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with Appendices I, II and III attached. Signed by Judge Anna M Manasco on 6/7/2021. (FNC) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathalie Holmes. Wexford Health Sources Inc served on 5/26/2021, answer due 6/16/2021. (MRR, ) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wexford Health Sources Inc. filed by Wexford Health Sources Inc (Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Wexford Health Sources Inc.(Piggott, Philip) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Wexford Health Sources Inc. Mailed certified mail. (MEB2) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Nathalie Holmes. (Porter, Adam) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3841586 (B4601113448). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Wexford Health Sources Inc, filed by Nathalie Holmes.(MRR, ). (Porter, Adam) Modified on 5/18/2021 (MRR, ). (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Wexford Health Sources Inc, filed by Nathalie Holmes.(MRR, ) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wexford Health Soures Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Philip Piggott