This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:01:40 (UTC).

Holmes v. Doe et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 Holmes filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott D. Johnson and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Scott D. Johnson

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Charlie Holmes

Defendants

John Doe

Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company

TVS Inc.

Gallagher Bassett Services, Inc.

TVS Inc. doing business as Deep South Freight

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Connie P. Trieu

Attorney at Trieu Law, LLC

537 Holmes Blvd., Suite A

Gretna, LA 70056

Defendant Attorneys

Emily E. Eagan

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC

701 Poydras Street, Ste. 4800

New Orleans,, LA 70139-4800

Ernest Paul Gieger, Jr.

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC - NO

701 Poydras Street, Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139

Stephen Wesley Gieger

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde, & Laperouse

701 Poydras St.

New Orleans, LA 70139

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Defendant's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company, TVS Inc. (Gieger, Stephen) Modified on 6/10/2020 to edit text (LT). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

#3

(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 5/4/2020. (KAH) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Letter to Attorney Connie P. Trieu regarding Allison J. Johnson who is Co-Counsel for party Charlie Holmes. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

1 #3

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Secretary of State Info

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial District Court, Ascension Parish, Case Number 128505. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2105857), filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company, TVS Inc. d/b/a Deep South Freight. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Secretary of State Info, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Gieger, Stephen) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's Affirmative Defenses and ANSWER to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages by Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company, TVS Inc. (Gieger, Stephen) Modified on 6/10/2020 to edit text (LT). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2020 at 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 5/4/2020. (KAH) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Letter to Attorney Connie P. Trieu regarding Allison J. Johnson who is Co-Counsel for party Charlie Holmes. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (EDC) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23rd Judicial District Court, Ascension Parish, Case Number 128505. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2105857), filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Insurance Company, TVS Inc. d/b/a Deep South Freight. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Secretary of State Info, #3 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(Gieger, Stephen) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TVS, Inc. d/b/a Deep South Freight is a litigant

Latest cases where Starr Indemnity & Liability Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Gallagher Bassett Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Connie P. Trieu(Designation Retained)