This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2022 at 10:09:09 (UTC).

Eric Holmes v. CRST, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 Eric Holmes filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CRST, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are David O. Carter and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00995

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Holmes

Defendants

Gardner Trucking, Inc.

CRST Expedited, Inc. (DEDICATED WEST DIVISION) formerly know as GARDNER TRUCKING INC doing business as CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc. Dedicated West formerly known as Gardner Trucking, Inc.

Michael Hines

Does 1-25 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olivia Uzan

Attorney at Derek Smith Law Group

Us Bank Tower, 633 West 5Th Street Suite 3250

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Kristen Jeannine Nesbit

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

LaLonnie Villa Gray

Attorney at Fisher and Phillips LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ERIC HOLMES re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court, County of Riverside #16 filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc.. (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#23

(#23) OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court, County of Riverside #16 filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc.. (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

#22

(#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss (partially dismiss Pltf's First Amended Complaint) #21 filed by Plaintiff Eric Holmes. (Uzan, Olivia) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

21 #2

Proposed Order

21 #1

Memorandum

21 #21

Main Document

16 #2

Declaration Eric Holmes

16 #1

Declaration Olivia Uzan

16 #16

Main Document

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-00995 CAS (SHKx). (car) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Kristen Nesbit re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendants Cassie Burrill, CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc. (Dedicated West) formerly known as Gardner Trucking, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. formerly known as CRST International, Inc., CRST Lincoln Sales Inc., CRST, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Cassie Burrill, CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc. (Dedicated West) formerly known as Gardner Trucking, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. formerly known as CRST International, Inc., CRST Lincoln Sales Inc., CRST, Inc. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Cassie Burrill, CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc. (Dedicated West) formerly known as Gardner Trucking, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. formerly known as CRST International, Inc., CRST Lincoln Sales Inc., CRST, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

1 #4

Declaration of Angela Stastny

1 #3

Declaration of Cassie Burrill

1 #2

Answer

1 #1

Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ERIC HOLMES re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court, County of Riverside #16 filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc.. (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court, County of Riverside #16 filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc.. (Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss (partially dismiss Pltf's First Amended Complaint) #21 filed by Plaintiff Eric Holmes. (Uzan, Olivia) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss (partially dismiss Pltf's First Amended Complaint) filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order) (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 07/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge David O. Carter re: MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court, County of Riverside #16 is continued to 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kdu) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand #16 are set for 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kdu) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE DAVID O. CARTER by Judge David O. Carter. (kdu) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Superior Court, County of Riverside filed by Plaintiff Eric Holmes. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Olivia Uzan, #2 Declaration Eric Holmes) (Uzan, Olivia) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 as to Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST Transportation Solution Inc. (twdb) (Entered: 07/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to CRST Expedited, Inc. answer now due 7/22/2022; CRST, Inc. answer now due 7/22/2022; Cassie Burrill answer now due 7/22/2022; CRST Lincoln Sales Inc. answer now due 7/22/2022, re Complaint - (Discovery), Answer to Complaint (Discovery) filed by Defendants CRST Expedited, Inc.; CRST, Inc.; Cassie Burrill; CRST Lincoln Sales Inc..(Gray, LaLonnie) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:22-cv-00995 CAS (SHKx). (car) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant CRST Expedited, Inc. Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CRST Training School, CRST, Inc., CRST International Inc., CRST Specialized Transportation Inc., CRST Lincoln Sales Inc., Gardner Trucking, Michael Hynes, Cassie Burrill, Jackie Unknown, Jessica Unknown Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Eric Holmes. Filed in State Court on 6/15/2022 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Kristen Nesbit re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendants Cassie Burrill, CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc. (Dedicated West) formerly known as Gardner Trucking, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. formerly known as CRST International, Inc., CRST Lincoln Sales Inc., CRST, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Cassie Burrill, CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc. (Dedicated West) formerly known as Gardner Trucking, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. formerly known as CRST International, Inc., CRST Lincoln Sales Inc., CRST, Inc. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Cassie Burrill, CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc. (Dedicated West) formerly known as Gardner Trucking, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. formerly known as CRST International, Inc., CRST Lincoln Sales Inc., CRST, Inc.. (Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVRI2201875 Receipt No: ACACDC-33477265 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Cassie Burrill, CRST Lincoln Sales Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. formerly known as CRST International, Inc., CRST, Inc., CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc. (Dedicated West) formerly known as Gardner Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Answer, #3 Declaration of Cassie Burrill, #4 Declaration of Angela Stastny) (Attorney Kristen Jeannine Nesbit added to party Cassie Burrill(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Jeannine Nesbit added to party CRST Expedited, Inc. dba CRST The Transportation Solution, Inc. (Dedicated West) formerly known as Gardner Trucking, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Jeannine Nesbit added to party CRST Expedited, Inc. formerly known as CRST International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Jeannine Nesbit added to party CRST Lincoln Sales Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Jeannine Nesbit added to party CRST, Inc.(pty:dft))(Nesbit, Kristen) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less