This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:00:48 (UTC).

HOLMAN v. LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Finance - Consumer Credit case was filed by HOLMAN against LVNV FUNDING, LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-03578

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

James Patrick Hanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANA HOLMAN

Defendant

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against LVNV FUNDING, LLC, filed by DANA HOLMAN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5594925) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The January 17, 2018, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - Relevant pages of Plaintiff's June 30, 2019, Experian credit report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#5

(#5) TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to LVNV FUNDING, LLC. (AKH) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER that a settlement has been reached in this action. Any pending motions are denied as moot, and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are vacated. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 28 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/16/2019.(CBU) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - The January 17, 2018, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#9

(#9) CLOSED DISMISSED (Marginal Notation) - The Court acknowledges Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, dkt. #8 , each party being responsible for its own respective costs and expenses, including but not limited to attorneys' fees, incurred in connection with this cause. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/30/2019.(DWH) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#4

(#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order of dismissal

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff DANA HOLMAN. (Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit A - Relevant pages of Plaintiff's June 30, 2019, Experian credit re

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information

1 #6

Proposed Summons

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CLOSED DISMISSED (Marginal Notation) - The Court acknowledges Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice, dkt. #8 , each party being responsible for its own respective costs and expenses, including but not limited to attorneys' fees, incurred in connection with this cause. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/30/2019.(DWH) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss with prejudice, filed by Plaintiff DANA HOLMAN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order of dismissal)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER that a settlement has been reached in this action. Any pending motions are denied as moot, and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are vacated. Parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal within 28 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/16/2019.(CBU) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN of Service, filed by DANA HOLMAN. LVNV FUNDING, LLC served on 8/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to LVNV FUNDING, LLC. (AKH) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff DANA HOLMAN. (Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against LVNV FUNDING, LLC, filed by DANA HOLMAN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5594925) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The January 17, 2018, letter sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - Relevant pages of Plaintiff's June 30, 2019, Experian credit report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Steinkamp, John) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less