This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2022 at 08:03:01 (UTC).

Holman v. Alabama Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2022 Holman filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Alabama Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffrey U. Beaverstock and Katherine P. Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00155

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeffrey U. Beaverstock

Referral Judge

Katherine P. Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Calvin Holman

Atmore, AL 36503

Defendants

Alabama Department of Corrections

R. Butler

A. McClain

D. Wright

H. Lambert

Mr. Murphy

Ms. Smith

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) 1983 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Calvin Holman. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 7/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Witnesses to the Matter, #4 Exhibits, #5 Cover Letter); ref to Judge Nelson/PSU (cmj) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

1 #1

List of Defendants

1 #2

Statement of Facts

1 #3

Witnesses to the Matter

1 #4

Exhibits

1 #5

Cover Letter

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Calvin Holman. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson/PSU. (cmj) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#3

(#3) Order for plaintiff to refile IFP on correct form no later than 5/24/22. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 5/24/2022.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/26/22. (order and IFP mailed to plaintiff) (cmj) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Calvin Holman. (Attachments: #1 "Motion to Correct Records" with copy of inmate account)Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

4 #1

"Motion to Correct Records" with copy of inmate account

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/2/22. (cmj) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#6

(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by Calvin Holman that this action be dismissed without prejudice as malicious. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/2/22. (copy of R&R and doc 5 mailed to plaintiff) (cmj) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#7

(#7) Order for Payment Prisoner Filing Fee. ADOC to collect payments pursuant to 28:1915(b)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/6/22. (copy to plaintiff, ADOC, business mngr and finance) (cmj) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order for Payment Prisoner Filing Fee. ADOC to collect payments pursuant to 28:1915(b)(2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/6/22. (copy to plaintiff, ADOC, business mngr and finance) (cmj) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint, filed by Calvin Holman that this action be dismissed without prejudice as malicious. Objections to R&R due 14 days from the date of service of this document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/2/22. (copy of R&R and doc 5 mailed to plaintiff) (cmj) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 6/2/22. (cmj) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Calvin Holman. (Attachments: #1 "Motion to Correct Records" with copy of inmate account)Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson. (cmj) (Entered: 05/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order for plaintiff to refile IFP on correct form no later than 5/24/22. ( Miscellaneous deadline set for 5/24/2022.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine P. Nelson on 4/26/22. (order and IFP mailed to plaintiff) (cmj) (Entered: 04/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Calvin Holman. Referred to Judge Katherine P. Nelson/PSU. (cmj) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) 1983 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Calvin Holman. 90 day Rule 4m deadline set for 7/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Witnesses to the Matter, #4 Exhibits, #5 Cover Letter); ref to Judge Nelson/PSU (cmj) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mr. Murphy is a litigant

Latest cases where Ms. Smith is a litigant

Latest cases where Alabama Department of Corrections is a litigant