This case was last updated from PACER on 08/29/2020 at 18:17:51 (UTC).

Holloway v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 Holloway filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Erin L. Wiedemann and Timothy L. Brooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-05113

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Erin L. Wiedemann

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Holloway

Defendant

Social Security Administration Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meghan M Gallo

Attorney at Gallo Curtis & Cazort

1 Halsted Circle, Suite 4

Rogers, AR 72756

Defendant Attorney

Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas

Attorney at OGCSSAR4

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; ORDER DIRECTING THE PLAINTIFF TO SERVE Social Security Administration Commissioner, the Attorney General of the State of Arkansas and Assistant US Attorney and granting 60 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 1, 2020. (lgd) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketTEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Timothy L. Brooks and Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann, as the referral judge. (tg) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Gallo, Meghan) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to William Barr, U.S. Attorney General for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Gallo, Meghan) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to U.S. Attorney's Office for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Gallo, Meghan) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ; ORDER DIRECTING THE PLAINTIFF TO SERVE Social Security Administration Commissioner, the Attorney General of the State of Arkansas and Assistant US Attorney and granting 60 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 1, 2020. (lgd) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 magistrate consent)(lgd) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patrick Holloway. (Gallo, Meghan) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Patrick Holloway.(Gallo, Meghan) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Patrick Holloway. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less