This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:37:59 (UTC).

HOLLOWAY v. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Finance - Consumer Credit case was filed by HOLLOWAY against OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-17137

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Esther Salas

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VICKIE HOLLOWAY

VICKIE M. HOLLOWAY

Defendants

OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC

RAS CITRON LLC

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT TO NOVEMBER 21, 2019 by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, RAS CITRON LLC. (NEEREN, DAVID) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID NEEREN on behalf of RAS CITRON LLC (NEEREN, DAVID) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that the deadline for PHH to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to October 21, 2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/19/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#5

(#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stipulation by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (MANSOOR, DUSTIN) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VICKIE M. HOLLOWAY. RAS CITRON LLC served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (MERINO, JAVIER) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VICKIE M. HOLLOWAY. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (MERINO, JAVIER) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, RAS CITRON LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

1 #11

Exhibit 11-Foreclosure Complaint

1 #10

Exhibit 10-RAS Reinstatement

1 #9

Exhibit 9-Letter to RAS

1 #8

Exhibit 8-Transaction Receipt

1 #7

Exhibit 7-Foreclosure Letter 7-3-2019

1 #6

Exhibit 6-Foreclosure Letter 7-1-2019

1 #5

Exhibit 5-Checks

1 #4

Exhibit 4-Mortgage Statement

1 #3

Exhibit 3-Money Orders

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Mortgage

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, RAS CITRON LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9915937) with JURY DEMAND, filed by VICKIE M. HOLLOWAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Mortgage, #2 Exhibit 2-Notice, #3 Exhibit 3-Money Orders, #4 Exhibit 4-Mortgage Statement, #5 Exhibit 5-Checks, #6 Exhibit 6-Foreclosure Letter 7-1-2019, #7 Exhibit 7-Foreclosure Letter 7-3-2019, #8 Exhibit 8-Transaction Receipt, #9 Exhibit 9-Letter to RAS, #10 Exhibit 10-RAS Reinstatement, #11 Exhibit 11-Foreclosure Complaint)(MERINO, JAVIER). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR ALL DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT TO NOVEMBER 21, 2019 by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, RAS CITRON LLC. (NEEREN, DAVID) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID NEEREN on behalf of RAS CITRON LLC (NEEREN, DAVID) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT; that the deadline for PHH to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint shall be extended to October 21, 2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/19/2019. (ld, ) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Stipulation by OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC. (MANSOOR, DUSTIN) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VICKIE M. HOLLOWAY. RAS CITRON LLC served on 8/29/2019, answer due 9/19/2019. (MERINO, JAVIER) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by VICKIE M. HOLLOWAY. OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC served on 8/27/2019, answer due 9/17/2019. (MERINO, JAVIER) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, RAS CITRON LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ld, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • CASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, ) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC, RAS CITRON LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9915937) with JURY DEMAND, filed by VICKIE M. HOLLOWAY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Mortgage, #2 Exhibit 2-Notice, #3 Exhibit 3-Money Orders, #4 Exhibit 4-Mortgage Statement, #5 Exhibit 5-Checks, #6 Exhibit 6-Foreclosure Letter 7-1-2019, #7 Exhibit 7-Foreclosure Letter 7-3-2019, #8 Exhibit 8-Transaction Receipt, #9 Exhibit 9-Letter to RAS, #10 Exhibit 10-RAS Reinstatement, #11 Exhibit 11-Foreclosure Complaint)(MERINO, JAVIER). (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.