This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 18:52:49 (UTC).

Holloway v. Loera et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Holloway filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Loera. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nancy J. Koppe and Jennifer A. Dorsey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01726

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Nevada District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

Presiding Judge

Jennifer A. Dorsey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andwanita Holloway

Defendants

Bertha Zepeda Loera

FD Nevada, LLC

FD Nevada, LLC doing business as Famous Dave's

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Ramzy P Ladah

Attorney at Las Vegas Personal Injury, PLLC

517 S. 3Rd Street

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Troy Clark

Attorney at Resnick & Louis

8925 W Russell Rd, Suite 220

Las Vegas, NV 89148

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation re Rule 26(f) Conference. The deadline to hold the Rule 26(f) conference is extended to 3/18/2020 with the resulting proposed discovery plan to be filed by 3/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#7

(#7) First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery To Stay Discovery Pending Final Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Andwanita Holloway. (Ladah, Ramzy) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/4/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Bertha Zepeda Loera and FD Nevada, LLC. (Clark, Troy) Modified on 10/5/2019 to include additional filing party (MMM). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bertha Zepeda Loera. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Bertha Zepeda Loera. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

1 #10

Exhibit

1 #9

Exhibit

1 #8

Exhibit

1 #7

Exhibit

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-802532-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5726685) by Bertha Zepeda Loera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/04/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation re Rule 26(f) Conference. The deadline to hold the Rule 26(f) conference is extended to 3/18/2020 with the resulting proposed discovery plan to be filed by 3/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery To Stay Discovery Pending Final Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Andwanita Holloway. (Ladah, Ramzy) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/7/2019. Defendants filed an answer prior to removal. Docket No. 1-8. The Court hereby ORDERS that a proposed discovery plan must be filed by November 18, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/4/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Bertha Zepeda Loera and FD Nevada, LLC. (Clark, Troy) Modified on 10/5/2019 to include additional filing party (MMM). (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bertha Zepeda Loera. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Bertha Zepeda Loera. (Clark, Troy) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-802532-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5726685) by Bertha Zepeda Loera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Troy A Clark

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ramzy P Ladah