This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 13:16:23 (UTC).

Holloway v. LM General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 Holloway filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against LM General Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick R Wyrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00397

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick R Wyrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Katherine M Holloway

Defendants

LM General Insurance Company

LM General Insurance Company doing business as Liberty Mutual

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric J Cavett

M Blake Yaffe

S Alex Yaffe

D Eliot Yaffe

Terry M McKeever

Defendant Attorneys

Margo E Shipley

William W O'Connor

Jerrick L Irby

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #5

Exhibit 5: Pleadings in Wisdom and Vang cases

10 #4

Exhibit 4: 12 O.S. Sec. 994

10 #3

Exhibit 3: Oklahoma Supreme Court Rule 1.60

10 #2

Exhibit 2: 12 O.S. Sec. 993

10 #1

Exhibit 1: 12 O.S. Sec. 952

#10

#9

#8

7 #1

Exhibit 1: Notice of Removal filed in Oklahoma County District Court

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - ROS_Summons to LMIC

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Petition

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Support re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Katherine M Holloway. (McKeever, Terry) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court and Brief in Support filed by LM General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: 12 O.S. Sec. 952, #2 Exhibit 2: 12 O.S. Sec. 993, #3 Exhibit 3: Oklahoma Supreme Court Rule 1.60, #4 Exhibit 4: 12 O.S. Sec. 994, #5 Exhibit 5: Pleadings in Wisdom and Vang cases)(O'Connor, William) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by M Blake Yaffe on behalf of Katherine M Holloway (Yaffe, M) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENTRY of Appearance by Terry M McKeever on behalf of Katherine M Holloway (McKeever, Terry) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Katherine M Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Notice of Removal filed in Oklahoma County District Court)(Cavett, Eric) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Eric J Cavett on behalf of Katherine M Holloway (Cavett, Eric) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Margo E Shipley on behalf of LM General Insurance Company (Shipley, Margo) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY of Appearance by Jerrick L Irby on behalf of LM General Insurance Company (Irby, Jerrick) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by LM General Insurance Company . (O'Connor, William) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by William W O'Connor on behalf of LM General Insurance Company (O'Connor, William) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3146628. (O'Connor, William) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2019-2374 filed by LM General Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons to LMIC, #3 Exhibit 3 - EOA for PL, #4 Exhibit 4 - Petition, #5 Exhibit 5 - ROS_Summons to LMIC, #6 Exhibit 6 - LM's Special EOA & ROT, #7 Exhibit 7 - DF's Motion to Dismiss, #8 Exhibit 8 - Dismissal of LM Ins Group, #9 Exhibit 9 - First Amended Petition, #10 Exhibit 10 - LMGIC's Answer to 1st Amended Petitio, #11 Exhibit 11 - EOA_OConnor for DF, #12 Exhibit 12 - EOA_Irby for DF, #13 Exhibit 13 - EOA_Shipley for DF, #14 Exhibit 14 - ROS_Summons to DF Duncan, #15 Exhibit 15 - Joint Motion for Entry of Protective Order, #16 Exhibit 16 - Agreed Protective Order, #17 Exhibit 17 - DF's Motion to Sever, #18 Exhibit 18 - Notice of Hearing, #19 Exhibit 19 - PL's Response to Motion to Sever, #20 Exhibit 20 - DF's Reply to Motion to Sever, #21 Exhibit 21 - Order on Motion to Sever, #22 Exhibit 22 - Summons to LMGIC, #23 Civil Cover Sheet)(ank) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less