This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:31:16 (UTC).

Holloway v. Hall et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Holloway filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Hall. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel P. Jordan, III and F. Keith Ball. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00889

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daniel P. Jordan, III

Referral Judge

F. Keith Ball

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Holloway

Pearl, MS 39288-8550

Defendants

ARP Director Richard Pennington

Investigator of ARP Raniece Matthews

Warden Unknown Banks

Deputy Warden James Fillyaw

Superintendent CMCF Ron King

Medical Director Gloria Perry

Jane & John Does 1-100

Deputy Commissioner Jerry Williams

Commissioner Pelicia Hall

Interested Party

Pro Se Department

 

Court Documents

10 #17

Envelope

10 #16

Exhibit 26 - Medical Request

10 #15

Exhibit 25 - Medical Request

10 #14

Exhibit 24 - Medical Request

10 #13

Exhibit 23 - Medical Request

10 #12

Exhibit 22 - Medical Request

10 #11

Exhibit 21 - Medical Request

10 #10

Exhibit 20 - Medical Request

10 #9

Exhibit 19 - Spiers Declaration

10 #8

Exhibit 18 - Long Declaration

10 #7

Exhibit 17 - RVR

10 #6

Exhibit 16 - RVR

10 #5

Exhibit 15 - RVR

10 #4

Exhibit 14 - Motion for PO

10 #3

Exhibit 13 - Settlement Agreement

10 #2

Exhibit 12 - Affidavit

10 #1

Exhibit 11 - Motion to Show Cause

#10

(#10) MOTION to Submit Additional Evidence by Jason Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 - Motion to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit 12 - Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 13 - Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit 14 - Motion for PO, #5 Exhibit 15 - RVR, #6 Exhibit 16 - RVR, #7 Exhibit 17 - RVR, #8 Exhibit 18 - Long Declaration, #9 Exhibit 19 - Spiers Declaration, #10 Exhibit 20 - Medical Request, #11 Exhibit 21 - Medical Request, #12 Exhibit 22 - Medical Request, #13 Exhibit 23 - Medical Request, #14 Exhibit 24 - Medical Request, #15 Exhibit 25 - Medical Request, #16 Exhibit 26 - Medical Request, #17 Envelope)(VM) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Submit Additional Evidence by Jason Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 - Motion to Show Cause, #2 Exhibit 12 - Affidavit, #3 Exhibit 13 - Settlement Agreement, #4 Exhibit 14 - Motion for PO, #5 Exhibit 15 - RVR, #6 Exhibit 16 - RVR, #7 Exhibit 17 - RVR, #8 Exhibit 18 - Long Declaration, #9 Exhibit 19 - Spiers Declaration, #10 Exhibit 20 - Medical Request, #11 Exhibit 21 - Medical Request, #12 Exhibit 22 - Medical Request, #13 Exhibit 23 - Medical Request, #14 Exhibit 24 - Medical Request, #15 Exhibit 25 - Medical Request, #16 Exhibit 26 - Medical Request, #17 Envelope)(VM) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER *RESTRICTED* denying #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and setting payment schedule as set forth in order. Signed by Chief District Judge Daniel P. Jordan III on January 30, 2020. (SP) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Acknowledgment of Receipt of Prisoner Litigation Reform Act and Amendments to MCA 47-5-138 Acknowledgement filed by Jason Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MGB) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: The Clerk is directed to mail to prisoner plaintiff a copy of notice of new law (PSP-1); Acknowledgment of Receipt and Certification (PSP-3); and form for voluntary dismissal (PSP-4). Plaintiff is directed to sign either the Acknowledgment (PSP-3) or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (PSP-4) and return to Clerk within 30 days of the date of this order or case may be dismissed without prejudice. Order with packet of forms mailed. Prisoner Petition Pleadings due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. Keith Ball on 12/9/2019. [Copy mailed to plaintiff] (LDR) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Amend/Correct #2 Complaint, to add Defendants by Jason Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Sworn Declaration of Chad Edward Spiers, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of Raymond Gilleo, #3 Exhibit B - Request for Adminastrative Remedy, #4 Envelope)(VM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jason Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(VM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) *RESTRICTED* MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jason Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(VM) ( (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Protective Order by Jason Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jason Holloway, #2 Affidavit James Long, #3 Affidavit Raymond Gilleo, #4 Cover Letter, #5 Envelope)(VM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Unknown Banks, James Fillyaw, Pelicia Hall, Ron King, Raniece Matthews, Richard Pennington, Gloria Perry, Jerry Williams, filed by Jason Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Offender mail services, #2 Exhibit B - Clothing and Linens, #3 Exhibit C - Protective Custody, #4 Exhibit D - Facility Sanitation, #5 Exhibit E - Medication Administration, #6 Exhibit F - Offender Visitation, #7 Exhibit G - Protection from Harm, #8 Exhibit H - Special Litigation Section, #9 Exhibit I - Retaliation, #10 Exhibit J - Holloway How to enter the ARP Process, #11 Exhibit K - Grievance Procedures, #12 Exhibit L - Gilleo How to enter the ARP Process, #13 Exhibit M - Long Sensitive issue request, #14 Exhibit N - Holloway Request for Administrative Remedy, #15 Exhibit O - Holoway Request for Administrative Remedy, #16 Exhibit P - Offender Recreation Program, #17 Exhibit Q - Care of the Physicall Disabled, #18 Cover Letter, #19 Envelope, #20 Notice of Assignment)(VM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER REQUIRING SEPARATE COMPLAINTS. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that civil action no. 3:19cv798-HTW-LRA shall be severed into three individual actions, one for each named plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Henry T. Wingate on 12/5/2019 (VM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.