This case was last updated from PACER on 12/20/2020 at 09:09:06 (UTC).

Holloway v. Clark et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2020 Holloway filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Clark. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Graham Mullen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00582

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Graham Mullen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mr David M Holloway

David M Holloway

Defendants

Mr. Richard Clark, Jr.

PTB Movie, LLC

Richard Clark, Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tara Warwick

Attorney at Carnes Warwick PLLC

555 Fayetteville Street, Suite 300

Raleigh, NC 27601

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Exhibit A to Affidavit of Service

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Service Completed by David M Holloway (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Service)(Warwick, Tara) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard Clark, Jr, PTB Movie, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(js) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Warwick on behalf of David M Holloway (Warwick, Tara) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

1 #2

Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits A - L to Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4724190), filed by David M Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - L to Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet)(Warwick, Tara) Modified text on 10/28/2020 to remove duplicate wording (rth). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Richard Clark, Jr answer due 11/16/2020; PTB Movie, LLC answer due 11/16/2020. (eef) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT re #3 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint, Service Completed by David M Holloway (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Affidavit of Service)(Warwick, Tara) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Richard Clark, Jr, PTB Movie, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons)(js) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(js) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Tara Warwick on behalf of David M Holloway (Warwick, Tara) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4724190), filed by David M Holloway. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - L to Complaint, #2 Cover Sheet)(Warwick, Tara) Modified text on 10/28/2020 to remove duplicate wording (rth). (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less