This case was last updated from PACER on 06/20/2021 at 14:07:41 (UTC).

Holloway v. BDM Mud, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Holloway filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against BDM Mud, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Drew B Tipton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Drew B Tipton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erica L Holloway

Defendants

BDM Mud, LLC

Q'Max America, Inc.

PRI Operating, LLC

Eastham Drilling, Inc doing business as Big E Drilling Co

In Re and Defendants

Anchor Drilling Fluids USA, LLC

Q'Max America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Britton Bryon Harris

Attorney at Harris Hilburn Sherer

1111 Rosalie

Houston, TX 77004

Iain Kennedy

Attorney at Nathan Sommers et al

2800 Post Oak Blvd, 61St Fl

Houston, TX 77056

Tyler Joseph McGuire

Attorney at Gray Reed et al

1300 Post Oak Blvd, Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

Andre M Landry, III

Attorney at Gray Reed et al

1300 Post Oak Blvd., Suite 2000

Houston, TX 77056

In Re Attorneys

John F Higgins, IV

Attorney at Porter Hedges LLP

1000 Main St, Suite 3600

Houston, TX 77002

Jonathan S Hawkins

Attorney at Thompson Hine

10050 Innovation Drive, Suite 400

Miamisburg, OH 45342

 

Court Documents

2 #1

BK- Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) MOTION to Withdraw Reference (Originally Filed on 03/08/2021) as to Bankruptcy Case No. ADV-20-06006-(bk) by BDM Mud, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 BK- Docket Sheet)(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

#1

(#1) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (ORDER)Withdrawal of ReferenceSigned by Judge Christopher M. Lopez, (BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Withdraw Reference (Originally Filed on 03/08/2021) as to Bankruptcy Case No. ADV-20-06006-(bk) by BDM Mud, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/13/2021. (Attachments: #1 BK- Docket Sheet)(BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for (ORDER)Withdrawal of ReferenceSigned by Judge Christopher M. Lopez, (BrendaLacy, 4) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anchor Drilling Fluids USA Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Q'MAX AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tyler Joseph McGuire