This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2022 at 13:07:29 (UTC).

Hollman v. Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/16/2020 Hollman filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-06491

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ruth Hollman

Defendants

Lupin Ltd.

Endo international PLC.

Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ranbaxy Laboratories LTD

Sun Pharmaceutical Holdings USA, Inc.

Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC

Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Lupin Inc.

Eurohealth (USA), Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited

Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd

Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC

ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC.

10 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cory Gavin Lee

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey E. Faucette

Heather Marie Burke

Jack E. Pace, III

Kathryn J. Mims

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy Koh no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/21. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#28

(#28) Case Reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

#27

(#27) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF RUTH HOLLMAN'S MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO MDL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 26, 2021. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Change of Address by Cory Gavin Lee (Lee, Cory) (Filed on 1/18/2021) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

#25

#24

#23

RESTRICTED

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

12/30/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#30) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Judge Lucy Koh no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 12/30/21. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/30/2021

DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Richard Seeborg. Judge Lucy H. Koh no longer assigned to the case. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/17/2021

Docket(#29) You are receiving this Notice because this case has been assigned to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh. On December 13, 2021, Judge Koh was confirmed to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit. The parties to this action are instructed to meet and confer to determine if collectively they will consent to transfer of this case to a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. On or before January 5, 2022, each party must file either (1) written consent to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge or (2) a request for reassignment of this case to a district judge. The parties may consent to the jurisdiction of a specific Magistrate Judge regardless of the division of the Court to which that Judge is assigned. In the event that the parties decline consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction, the case will be randomly reassigned to a district judge who likely will not be resident in the San Jose division of the Court. ON BEHALF OF THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE, Richard Seeborg, Chief Judge. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ecg-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2021) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#28) Case Reassigned to Judge Lucy H. Koh. Judge Vince Chhabria no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2021) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF RUTH HOLLMAN'S MOTION TO TRANSFER CASE TO MDL. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on January 26, 2021. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2021) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/18/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) NOTICE of Change of Address by Cory Gavin Lee (Lee, Cory) (Filed on 1/18/2021) (Entered: 01/18/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/03/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Of Defendants WOCKHARDT LTD.; MORTON GROVE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC,; WOCKHARDT USA LLC; MALLINCKRODT PLC; AND MALLINCKRODT LLC ONLY by Ruth Hollman (Lee, Cory) (Filed on 11/3/2020) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) Copy of docket sheet and Notice of Related Action to MDL Panel (MDL 2966). (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) Transcript of Proceedings held on October 15, 2020, before Judge Vince Chhabria. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (82 in 3:20-cv-04056-VC) Transcript Order, (81 in 3:20-cv-04056-VC) Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 11/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/19/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2021. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) Case reassigned toJudge Vince Chhabria. Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2020) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
09/23/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER IN REASSIGNED CASE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/21/2021 09:30 AM in San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/14/2021. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/23/2020. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 9/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020

Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ruth Hollman.. (Lee, Cory) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2020 01:30 PM. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo international PLC., Eurohealth (USA), Inc., Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC, Hikma Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals PLC, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Lupin Inc., Lupin Ltd., Lupin Pharmaceuticals Inc, MALLINCKRODT LLC., Mallinckrodt PLC, Morton Grove Pharmaceuticals, Inc., PAR Pharmaceutical Inc.,, ROXANE LABORATORIES, INC., Ranbaxy Laboratories LTD, Sun Pharmaceutical Holdings USA, Inc., Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Watson Laboratories, Inc., West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Wockhardt LTD, Wockhardt USA LLC. (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2020) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020

Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/1/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/17/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet by Ruth Hollman Amended. (Lee, Cory) (Filed on 9/17/2020) (Entered: 09/17/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Lee, Cory) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/16/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT CLASS ACTION with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14948468.). Filed byRuth Hollman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet: Refiled at Doc #3 )(Lee, Cory) (Filed on 9/16/2020) Modified on 9/18/2020 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less