This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2019 at 07:46:39 (UTC).

Hollinshead v. Medical University of South Carolina, The

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by Hollinshead against Medical University of South Carolina, The in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02517

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Bristow Marchant

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tocarra Hollinshead

Defendant

Medical University of South Carolina, The

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas J Rode

Attorney at Thurmond Kirchner and Timbes PA

15 Middle Atlantic Wharf, Suite 101

Charleston, SC 29401

Defendant Attorney

Bob J Conley

Attorney at Cleveland and Conley

171 Church Street, Suite 310

Charleston, SC 29401

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Tocarra Hollinshead. Answer due by 10/15/2019. All Defendants. (Rode, Thomas) Modified on 9/25/2019 to add answer due date (egra, ). (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Medical University of South Carolina, The. (bshr, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tocarra Hollinshead.(bshr, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER The file reflects that the Summons and Complaint were served on the Defendant on September 24, 2019. However, no responsive pleading has been filed, nor has there been any further activity in the file. Therefore, It is ordered that Plaintiff shall advise the Court of the status of this matter, in writing, by no later than November 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/30/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Medical University of South Carolina, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8654312.), filed by Tocarra Hollinshead. Service due by 12/5/2019(bshr, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER The file reflects that the Summons and Complaint were served on the Defendant on September 24, 2019. However, no responsive pleading has been filed, nor has there been any further activity in the file. Therefore, It is ordered that Plaintiff shall advise the Court of the status of this matter, in writing, by no later than November 8, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 10/30/2019. (egra, ) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Tocarra Hollinshead. Answer due by 10/15/2019. All Defendants. (Rode, Thomas) Modified on 9/25/2019 to add answer due date (egra, ). (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Medical University of South Carolina, The. (bshr, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Tocarra Hollinshead.(bshr, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Medical University of South Carolina, The ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8654312.), filed by Tocarra Hollinshead. Service due by 12/5/2019(bshr, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less