This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/10/2022 at 07:32:22 (UTC).

Hollins v. Standard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 Hollins filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Standard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah L. Boardman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01121

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah L. Boardman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jovita Hollins

Defendant

Standard Insurance Company

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Transfer Notification Letter (c/m 5/9/2022 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

13 #1

*Restricted*

13 #13

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#12

(#12) ORDER transferring case to another district: ORDER transferring case to the District of Maryland; original electronic record and certified copy of docket entries will be sent electronically to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 04/25/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#11

(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Walters, Jason) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

10 #3

Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

10 #10

Main Document

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT- The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:22 CV 236 AKK on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#7

(#7) Brief re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Walters, Jason) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Claim Correspondence

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jovita Hollins. Standard Insurance Company served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (KAM) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. Mailed certified mail. (AKD) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Jovita Hollins. (Burke, Peter) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Transfer Notification Letter (c/m 5/9/2022 - mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:22-cv-00236. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER transferring case to another district: ORDER transferring case to the District of Maryland; original electronic record and certified copy of docket entries will be sent electronically to Clerk of Court 10 business days from this date. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 04/25/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Walters, Jason) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jovita Hollins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Burke, Peter) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT- The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, the above styled civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 2:22 CV 236 AKK on all subsequent pleadings. (AKD) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER setting briefing schedule re #6 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's response is due by April 6, 2022. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by April 13, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 3/23/2022. (CDG) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Brief re #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Walters, Jason) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Claim Correspondence)(Walters, Jason) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jovita Hollins. Standard Insurance Company served on 3/4/2022, answer due 3/25/2022. (KAM) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. Mailed certified mail. (AKD) (Entered: 03/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Jovita Hollins. (Burke, Peter) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-4019924 (ALND receipt# B4601118710). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company, filed by Jovita Hollins. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(AKD). (Burke, Peter) Modified on 2/24/2022 (AKD). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company, filed by Jovita Hollins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(AKD) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Standard Insurance Co. Inc. is a litigant