This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/15/2021 at 08:52:58 (UTC).

Hollingsworth v. IQ Data International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Hollingsworth filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against IQ Data International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02522

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Hollingsworth

Defendant

IQ Data International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Christine Marie Kroupa

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 October 2021. Before the Court is the Motion to Withdraw filed by Craig D. Johnson, Esq., counsel for Plaintiff. For good cause, the Motion #11 is granted. Mr. Johnson's representation of Plaintiff in this case is terminated. On or before October 29, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a notice with the Clerk of Court to provide his contact information (mailing address and telephone number). Should Plaintiff obtain new counsel, that new counsel shall file a notice of appearance on or before November 5, 2021. The Scheduling Conference currently set for November 4, 2021 is vacated. The Court will re-set it at the later appropriate time.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#16

(#16) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 October 2021. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing no later than November 5, 2021 as to why this Court should not dismiss this case for his failure to communicate with his attorney and the resulting failure to prosecute this case. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss his claims, or recommend their dismissal, without further notice. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER y Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 October 2021. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) at ECF #14 . Defendants Dover Street Owner, LLC and Holland Partner Group Management, Inc. are dismissed as Defendants. The Clerk of Court shall terminate them as parties to this civil action. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

14 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by IQ Data International, Inc..(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

11 #2

Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Plaintiff's

11 #1

Exhibit Notice of Withdrawal

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) NOTICE of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant IQ Data International, Inc. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant IQ Data International, Inc.. IQ Data International, Inc. answer due 10/14/2021. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American Bankers Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent TS Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc. for IQ Data International, Inc.. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

#7

(#7) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 September 2021. Consent Form due by 10/26/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/28/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon IQ Data International, Inc. on 8/17/2021 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT against Dover Street Owner, LLC, Holland Partner Group Management, Inc., IQ Data International, Inc., filed by Daniel Hollingsworth.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Civil Cover Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 October 2021. Before the Court is the Motion to Withdraw filed by Craig D. Johnson, Esq., counsel for Plaintiff. For good cause, the Motion #11 is granted. Mr. Johnson's representation of Plaintiff in this case is terminated. On or before October 29, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a notice with the Clerk of Court to provide his contact information (mailing address and telephone number). Should Plaintiff obtain new counsel, that new counsel shall file a notice of appearance on or before November 5, 2021. The Scheduling Conference currently set for November 4, 2021 is vacated. The Court will re-set it at the later appropriate time.(cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 October 2021. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing no later than November 5, 2021 as to why this Court should not dismiss this case for his failure to communicate with his attorney and the resulting failure to prosecute this case. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss his claims, or recommend their dismissal, without further notice. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER y Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 October 2021. Before the Court is Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) at ECF #14 . Defendants Dover Street Owner, LLC and Holland Partner Group Management, Inc. are dismissed as Defendants. The Clerk of Court shall terminate them as parties to this civil action. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party DOVER STREET OWNER, LLC, AND HOLLAND PARTNER GROUP MANANGMENT, INC., PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Plaintiff Daniel Hollingsworth (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) ORDER RE: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS DOVER STREET OWNER, LLC, AND HOLLAND PARTNER GROUP MANANGMENT, INC., PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i))(Johnson, Craig) (Entered: 10/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by IQ Data International, Inc..(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • Docket(#12) ORDER setting expedited deadline to respond to the Motion to Withdraw (ECF 11). The Court notes that the Dover Street and Holland Entities oppose that Motion. Those Defendants have until the close of business on October 15, 2021 to file a response to the Motion. by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/14/2021. Text Only Entry (mehlc1, ) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Plaintiff Daniel Hollingsworth. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Withdrawal, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Plaintiff's Counsel)(Johnson, Craig) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant IQ Data International, Inc. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant IQ Data International, Inc.. IQ Data International, Inc. answer due 10/14/2021. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent American Bankers Insurance Group, Inc., Corporate Parent TS Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Assurant, Inc. for IQ Data International, Inc.. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 20 September 2021. Consent Form due by 10/26/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/28/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 11/4/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon IQ Data International, Inc. on 8/17/2021 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Dover Street Owner, LLC, Holland Partner Group Management, Inc., IQ Data International, Inc., filed by Daniel Hollingsworth.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IQ Data International, Inc. from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number 2021-CV-30881. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8078648), filed by IQ Data International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 State Court Summons, #5 State Court Affidavit of Service on IQ Data, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less