This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2021 at 09:11:38 (UTC).

HOLLINGSWORTH et al v. DEBTSY, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 HOLLINGSWORTH filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against DEBTSY, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00479

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR

Referral Judge

JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JACQUELYN HOLLINGSWORTH

JEFFREY EUBANKS

Defendant

DEBTSY, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCOTT C. HARRIS

Attorney at MILBERG COLEMAN BRYSON PHILLIPS GROSSMAN, PLLC

900 W. Morgan Street

Raleigh, NC 27603

S. MICHAEL DUNN

Attorney at MILBERG COLEMAN BRYSON PHILLIPS GROSSMAN, PLLC

900 W. Morgan Street

Raleigh, NC 27603

Defendant Attorneys

ALLISON J. BECKER

Attorney at YATES, MCLAMB & WEYHER, LLP

434 Fayetteville St., Ste. 2200

Raleigh, NC 27601

KENDRA N. STARK

Attorney at TEAGUE CAMPBELL DENNIS & GORHAM, LLP

4700 Falls Of Neuse Road

Raleigh, NC 27609

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

5 #1

Consent Form

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer for DEBTSY, INC. Answer due by 8/30/2021. Signed by John Brubaker, Clerk of Court, on 7/29/2021. (Brubaker, John) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by DEBTSY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BECKER, ALLISON) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by DEBTSY, INC.. (BECKER, ALLISON) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney KENDRA N. STARK on behalf of Defendant DEBTSY, INC. (STARK, KENDRA) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney ALLISON J. BECKER on behalf of Defendant DEBTSY, INC. (BECKER, ALLISON) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by attorney S. MICHAEL DUNN on behalf of Plaintiffs JEFFREY EUBANKS, JACQUELYN HOLLINGSWORTH (DUNN, S.) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Certified Mail as to DEBTSY, INC. served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. (HARRIS, SCOTT) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE WILLIAM L. OSTEEN, JR and MAG/JUDGE JOI ELIZABETH PEAKE. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Right to Consent. Counsel shall serve the attached form on all parties. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to DEBTSY, INC. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JEFFREY EUBANKS. (HARRIS, SCOTT) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JACQUELYN HOLLINGSWORTH. (HARRIS, SCOTT) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DEBTSY, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0418-3066594.), filed by JACQUELYN HOLLINGSWORTH, JEFFREY EUBANKS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HARRIS, SCOTT) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer S. Michael Dunn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Crissman Harris