This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 07:46:00 (UTC).

Hollimon v. Burdo

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Hollimon filed an Other lawsuit against Burdo. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard F. Boulware, II and Elayna J. Youchah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01678

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

Referral Judge

Elayna J. Youchah

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brandon John Hollimon

Pahrump, NV 89060

Legion Designs

Defendants

Meagan Burdo

Brandon John Hollimon LLC

GoDaddy

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Additional IFP Application

1 #2

Complaint

1 #3

Amended Complaint

1 #4

Amended Complaint

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

(#3) ORDER denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Amended Complaint deadline: 10/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IFP non-inmate form/instructions mailed to P - HAM) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Duplicate Filings by Brandon John Hollimon LLC, Legion Designs of #1 -1 IFP Application and #1 -5 Civil Cover. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HAM) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

4 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re: #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that this matter be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this Court's September 14, 2021 Order. Objections to R&R due by 11/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Re: #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that this matter be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this Court's September 14, 2021 Order. Objections to R&R due by 11/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/8/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Duplicate Filings by Brandon John Hollimon LLC, Legion Designs of #1 -1 IFP Application and #1 -5 Civil Cover. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (HAM) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Amended Complaint deadline: 10/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IFP non-inmate form/instructions mailed to P - HAM) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (HAM) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon John Hollimon. (Attachments: #1 Additional IFP Application, #2 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (HAM) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (DRS) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Godaddy, Inc is a litigant