This case was last updated from PACER on 07/18/2021 at 08:17:02 (UTC).

Holliday v. Thomas et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 Holliday filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Thomas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly L. Teeter and Angel D. Mitchell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02230

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Holly L. Teeter

Referral Judge

Angel D. Mitchell

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Monique L Holliday

Monique L. Holliday

Defendants

Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company

Bernard Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerald Gray, II

Attorney at G. Gray Law, LLC

104 West 9Th Street, Suite 401

Kansas City, MO 64105

Defendant Attorneys

Brette S. Hart

Attorney at Harris & Hart, LLC

9260 Glenwood Street

Overland Park, KS 66212

Matthew W. Greenberg

Attorney at Harris & Hart, LLC

9260 Glenwood Street

Overland Park, KS 66212

Taylor L. Connolly

Attorney at Brown & James, PC - KC

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 2100

Kansas City, MO 64108

David R. Buchanan

Attorney at Brown & James, PC - KC

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 2100

Kansas City, MO 64108

 

Court Documents

19 #1

*Restricted*

#19

#18

15 #1

Proposed Sealed Document Proposed Order

#15

#14

#13

#12

#10

9 #1

*Restricted*

#8

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

State Court Records Ex. B

1 #2

Exhibit Ex. A

1 #1

Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Monique L. Holliday re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gray, Gerald) Modified on 7/13/2021 to block exhibit 1 which contained personal identifiers. (ca). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: estimated trial time 3-4 days. Discovery deadline 11/30/2021. Dispositive motion deadline 1/14/2022. Mediation deadline 11/30/2021. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 10/29/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/14/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/21/2021 at 10:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/23/2021. (ht) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/23/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ks) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response deadline is on or before 7/12/2021. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 6/21/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Opposition to Summary Judgment as to #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ks) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Opposition to Summary Judgment as to #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Monique L. Holliday (Attachments: #1 Proposed Sealed Document Proposed Order)(Gray, Gerald) (Entered: 06/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26 Disclosures by Monique L. Holliday (Gray, Gerald) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF SERVICE by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company of Defendant Progressive's Initial Disclosures (Greenberg, Matthew) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Bernard Thomas. (Connolly, Taylor) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DOCKET ANNOTATION: A redacted version of Exhibit 1 has been added to the entry #9 MOTION for Summary Judgment and is attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (ca) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List Index of Exhibits)(Greenberg, Matthew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2021: #2 Redacted Exhibit List Index of Exhibits) (ca). (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2021 at 11:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 6/2/2021. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 6/16/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 6/16/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 6/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/25/2021. (ht) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (amended state court petition) by Bernard Thomas. (FILED IN WYANDOTTE COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 1/18/2021. SEE Doc. #1 for pleading).(ca) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (amended state court petition) by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company. (FILED IN WYANDOTTE COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 11/10/2020, SEE Doc #1 for pleading).(ca) (Entered: 05/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF CONSENT TO JOIN by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Greenberg, Matthew) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Brette S. Hart on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Hart, Brette) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Matthew W. Greenberg on behalf of Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company (Greenberg, Matthew) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Bernard Thomas - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Connolly, Taylor) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Wyandotte County, case number 2020-CV-000414 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5492296.), filed by Bernard Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 State Court Records Ex. B)(Connolly, Taylor) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE NORTHWESTERN INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant