This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/03/2020 at 08:12:44 (UTC).

Holland v. Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Holland filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Jodi F Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00663

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Jodi F Jayne

 

Party Details

Defendants

Cody Smith

Dick White

Flint Junod

Newt Stephens

Kelsey Straley

Samuel Denton

Leon Warner

Kevin Winters

Randal Arnold

Colton Brownfield

Lance Prout

Julie Hightower

Chuck Mitchell

Jon Echols

Lane Conner

Cory Ward

Trent Smith

Nicole Bynum

Christopher Hinojosa

Menter Kalevik

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Steven James Terrill

Attorney at Bryan & Terrill Law, PLLC

3015 E Skelly Dr Ste 400

Tulsa, OK 74105

Paulina Thompson

Attorney at Johnson Hanan & Vosler

9801 N Broadway Ext

Oklahoma City, OK 73114

John Spencer Bryan

Attorney at Bryan & Terrill Law, PLLC

3015 E Skelly Dr Ste 400

Tulsa, OK 74105

Sean Patrick Snider

Attorney at Johnson Hanan & Vosler

9801 N Broadway Ext

Oklahoma City, OK 73114

 

Court Documents

#9

#8

#7

#6

#4

3 #1

Appendix Addendum A - Parties

#3

2 #55

Exhibit Docket Sheet

2 #53

Exhibit Order Granting Turn Key's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amende

2 #52

Exhibit Notice of Ruling on Motion to Stay

2 #40

Exhibit Order Granting Defendant's Application to File a Reply Brief

2 #39

Exhibit Order Setting for Hearing Defendant's Application to File a Reply B

2 #38

Exhibit Estate's Response to Turn Key's Application to File a Reply Br

2 #37

Exhibit Defendant's Application to File a Reply Brief

2 #36

Exhibit Estate's Response to Turn Key's Motion to Dismiss Amended Peti

2 #34

Exhibit Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Petition

2 #33

Exhibit Amended Petition

2 #32

Exhibit Order

54 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC ; (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Docket Entry Modification; Error: wrong event selected (Reply to Response to Motion); Correction: changed text to reflect correct event (Response in Opposition to Motion) (Re: #8 Reply to Response to Motion ) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss ) by Larry Holland ; (Bryan, John) Modified on 1/14/2020 to change text to reflect correct event (sac, Dpty Clk). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent TK Health Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent TCSCFI TK, LLC for Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC) by Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Paulina Thompson on behalf of Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 12/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC (With attachments) (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Creek County District Court, case number CJ-2018-35 (paid $400 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2146212) by Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC (With attachments) (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Turn Key Health Clinics, LLC (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketAmended PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against All Defendants by Larry Holland (dlg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paulina Thompson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Patrick Snider

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven James Terrill

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Spencer Bryan