This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2020 at 09:13:14 (UTC).

Holland v. Saul

Case Summary

On 09/10/2020 Holland filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth D. Bell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00249

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth D. Bell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Brian Holland

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell R. Bowling

Attorney at Law Office of Russell R. Bowling

77 West Main St.

Franklin, NC 28734

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 09/23/2020. (hms) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Andrew M. Saul, US Attorney and US Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Forms) (hms) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 09/23/2020. (hms) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Kenneth D. Bell. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(khm) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Robert Brian Holland. (Bowling, Russell) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/11/2020) NEF Regenerated. (khm) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Robert Brian Holland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bowling, Russell) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less