This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/12/2020 at 08:38:29 (UTC).

Holland v. Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 Holland filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Abbott Laboratories, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Embry J. Kidd and Carlos E. Mendoza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-01469

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

Presiding Judge

Carlos E. Mendoza

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly Holland

Defendant

Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig Ronald Lynd

Attorney at Kaufman & Lynd

Suite 250, 200 East Robinson St

Orlando, FL 32801

Jeffrey S. Kaufman, Jr.

Attorney at Kaufman & Lynd

Suite 250, 200 East Robinson St

Orlando, FL 32801

Christopher H. Hunt

Attorney at Kaufman & Lynd

Suite 250, 200 East Robinson St

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa M. Baird

Attorney at Reed Smith, LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Dr Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

Christina D. Olivos

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, 9Th Floor

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#23

#21

#19

#18

#17

#16

15 #1

Exhibit 1

#15

#13

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

State Court Docket Sheet

1 #2

State Court Other Documents Ex. B

1 #1

State Court COMPLAINT Ex. A

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY to #18 Response in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Baird, Lisa) Modified text on 9/28/2020 (ARJ). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ENDORSED ORDER granting in part and denying in part #21 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties may have until and through October 5, 2020, to conduct their case management conference. The parties may conduct the case management conference by video or telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 9/23/2020. (Kidd, Embry) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically for Extension of Time to Conduct Case Management Conference and for Leave to Conduct Conference via Videoconference by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Baird, Lisa) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketSet deadlines: Replies due by 9/25/2020. (ARJ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Reply. On or before September 25, 2020, Plaintiffs may file a Reply of ten or fewer pages. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 9/14/2020. (AMD) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support by Abbott Laboratories, Inc. re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Abbott Laboratories, Inc(Baird, Lisa) Modified text and created link on 9/10/2020 (TNP). (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kelly Holland. (Lynd, Craig) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kelly Holland. Related case(s): Yes (per doc) (Lynd, Craig) Modified on (edited text) 9/3/2020 (EJS). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER by Kelly Holland. (Lynd, Craig) Modified on 9/3/2020 (edit text, created link) (EJS). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Request for Judicial NOTICE regarding #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Baird, Lisa) Modified on 8/26/2020 (ARJ). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 1/3/2020. (PML) ctp (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant may have until and through August 25, 2020, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 8/16/2020. (Kidd, Embry) (Entered: 08/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal - State Court Complaint by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Baird, Lisa) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/14/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/28/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/14/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/28/2020. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 8/14/2020. (MEH) ctp (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • Docket(#4) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Carlos E. Mendoza and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:20-cv-1469-Orl-41EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Olivos, Christina) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Abbott Laboratories, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Abbott Laboratories, Other Affiliate St. Jude Medical, LLC for Abbott Laboratories, Inc... (Baird, Lisa) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Eighteenth Judicial Circuit - Brevard County, FL, case number 05-2020-CA-034044 filed in State Court on 07/08/2020. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-17178851 filed by Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT Ex. A, #2 State Court Other Documents Ex. B, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baird, Lisa) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Abbott Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher H. Hunt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig Ronald Lynd