This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2021 at 07:24:44 (UTC).

Gabriel Holguin v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2021 Gabriel Holguin filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Dale S. Fischer and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00760

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GABRIEL HOLGUIN

Defendants

THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA

RADIOLOGY PARTNERS INC. HEALTH AND WELFARE PLAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Phillip S Bather

Frank N Darras

Susan B Grabarsky

Defendant Attorneys

Patricia A Ellis

Jason A James

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, identifying The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Prudential Financial, Inc. (Attorney Jason A James added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(James, Jason) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 3/31/2021, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Patricia A Ellis added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Ellis, Patricia) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Gabriel Holguin, upon Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 2/8/2021, answer due 3/1/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez of C.T. Corporation Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (jre) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Radiology Partners Inc. Health and Welfare Plan. (lh) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (lh) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff GABRIEL HOLGUIN. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff GABRIEL HOLGUIN. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GABRIEL HOLGUIN. (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff GABRIEL HOLGUIN, (Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30287581 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff GABRIEL HOLGUIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint) (Attorney Susan B Grabarsky added to party GABRIEL HOLGUIN(pty:pla))(Grabarsky, Susan) (Entered: 01/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less