This case was last updated from PACER on 04/27/2021 at 10:19:56 (UTC).

Holcim (US) Inc. v. Killoran Trucking & Brokerage, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2021 Holcim US Inc filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Killoran Trucking Brokerage, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Dakota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Clare R. Hochhalter and Daniel M. Traynor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00043

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Clare R. Hochhalter

Presiding Judge

Daniel M. Traynor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holcim (US) Inc. doing business as LafargeHolcim

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Killoran Trucking, LLC

Killoran Trucking & Brokerage, Inc.

Counter Defendant

Holcim (US) Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Steven J. Sheridan

Attorney at Fisher Bren & Sheridan, LLP

920 Second Avenue S., Suite 975

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Andrew D. Cook

Attorney at Ohnstad Twichell

901 13Th Ave. E., P.O. Box 458

West Fargo, ND 58078-0458

Stephen R. Hanson, II

Attorney at Ohnstad Twichell, P.C.

444 Sheyenne Street, Suite 102

West Fargo, ND 58078

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Holcim (US) Inc. by Killoran Trucking & Brokerage, Inc., Killoran Trucking, LLC.(Cook, Andrew) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#7

(#7) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Holcim (US) Inc. (cjs) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holcim (US) Inc.. Killoran Trucking, LLC served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021 (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holcim (US) Inc.. Killoran Trucking & Brokerage, Inc. served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021 (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Holcim (US) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Holcim Participations (US) Inc. for Holcim (US) Inc... (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Holcim (US) Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/12/2021. (jb) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Killoran Trucking & Brokerage, Inc., Killoran Trucking, LLC. (jb) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Transportation Brokerage Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Killoran Trucking & Brokerage, Inc., Killoran Trucking, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000410) filed by Holcim (US) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transportation Brokerage Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 9:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. By Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter. (BG) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Holcim (US) Inc. by Killoran Trucking & Brokerage, Inc., Killoran Trucking, LLC.(Cook, Andrew) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket(#8) (Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Daniel M. Traynor, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter, as referral judge, for all further proceedings by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Magistrate Judge Clare R. Hochhalter no longer assigned as presiding judge.(cjs) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Holcim (US) Inc. (cjs) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holcim (US) Inc.. Killoran Trucking, LLC served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021 (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holcim (US) Inc.. Killoran Trucking & Brokerage, Inc. served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021 (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Holcim (US) Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Holcim Participations (US) Inc. for Holcim (US) Inc... (Sheridan, Steven) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Holcim (US) Inc. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 3/12/2021. (jb) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Killoran Trucking & Brokerage, Inc., Killoran Trucking, LLC. (jb) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Killoran Trucking & Brokerage, Inc., Killoran Trucking, LLC (Filing fee $402, receipt number 121000410) filed by Holcim (US) Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transportation Brokerage Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Holcim (US) Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven J Sheridan