This case was last updated from PACER on 11/05/2019 at 08:12:10 (UTC).

Hogquist v. Anoka County District Courts et al

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 Hogquist filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Anoka County District Courts. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine M. Menendez and Wilhelmina M. Wright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-02471

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michelle Lyn Hogquist

Anoka, MN 55303

Respondents

City of Anoka Police Department

Attorney General

State of Minnesota, The

Anoka County District Courts

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Edwin William Stockmeyer, III

Bremer Tower, Suite 1800, 445 Minnesota Street

St. Paul, MN 55101-2134

Matthew Frank

Attorney at Minnesota Attorney General's Office - Ste 1800

445 Minnesota St Ste 1800

St Paul, MN 55101-2134

Kelsey R Kelley

Attorney at Anoka County Attorney's Office

2100 3Rd Ave N., Ste 720

Anoka, MN 55303-2265

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) LETTER from Clerk's Office to Michelle Lyn Hogquist in response to Letters #4 , #5 . (lmb) cc: Michelle Lyn Hogquist with Resources for Finding an Attorney. (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Minnesota, The (Kelley, Kelsey) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey R Kelley on behalf of State of Minnesota, The. (Kelley, Kelsey) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

5 #4

Envelope

5 #3

Envelope

5 #2

Exhibit(s)

5 #1

Exhibit(s)

#5

(#5) LETTER to The Court from Michelle Lyn Hogquist. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Envelope, #4 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/10/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

4 #1

Envelope

3 #1

Cover Letter Attorney Substitution

#3

(#3) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Anoka County District Courts, Attorney General, City of Anoka Police Department, State of Minnesota, The Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michelle Lyn Hogquist. (MKB) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michelle Lyn Hogquist. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (MKB) cc: Hogquist. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #2 Rescanned Petition) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail Returned as Undeliverable. NEF and Documents #10 not re-sent to Michelle Lyn Hogquist as address is unknown. (KDS) Document QC'd by KMH on 11/1/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail Returned as Undeliverable. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #11 not sent to Michelle Lyn Hogquist. No forwarding address. (CLK) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/30/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michelle Lyn Hogquist, #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michelle Lyn Hogquist filed by Michelle Lyn Hogquist. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 10/24/2019. (KAT) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SEALED EXHIBIT by Michelle Hogquist. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(kt)RESTRICTED PER JUDGE MENENDEZ'S CHAMBERS. (kt) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/22/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • (#9) Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail not resent to Michelle Lyn Hogquist. Return to Sender, Not Here, Released on 9/30/2019, No Forwarding Address..(MMP) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER from Clerk's Office to Michelle Lyn Hogquist in response to Letters #4 , #5 . (lmb) cc: Michelle Lyn Hogquist with Resources for Finding an Attorney. (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State of Minnesota, The (Kelley, Kelsey) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey R Kelley on behalf of State of Minnesota, The. (Kelley, Kelsey) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) LETTER to The Court from Michelle Lyn Hogquist. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Envelope, #4 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/10/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: rescanned Petition to include p. 10 and backside of last page. (KMH) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER to The Court from Michelle Lyn Hogquist. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lmb) Document QC'd by KMH on 10/7/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Anoka County District Courts, Attorney General, City of Anoka Police Department, State of Minnesota, The Attorney Substitution. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter Attorney Substitution)(Stockmeyer, Edwin) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Michelle Lyn Hogquist. (MKB) Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michelle Lyn Hogquist. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per Civil (3rd, 4th - Prisoner) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (MKB) cc: Hogquist. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/26/2019: #2 Rescanned Petition) (KMH). Document QC'd by KMH on 9/26/2019 (KMH). (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.