This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/24/2022 at 09:41:52 (UTC).

HOGAN v. TUMEY et al

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 HOGAN filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against TUMEY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane Magnus-Stinson and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00472

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jane Magnus-Stinson

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RASHAAD HOGAN

Michigan City, IN 46360

Defendants

T. TUMEY

NORTON

MALLOTT

MURRAY

YARBER

VAUGHN

KOZATEK

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against KOZATEK, MALLOTT, MURRAY, NORTON, T. TUMEY, VAUGHN, YARBER, filed by RASHAAD HOGAN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KAA) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

1 #1

Exhibits

#2

(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. mail. (MEH) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

#4

(#4) CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by RASHAAD HOGAN located at WVCF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by RASHAAD HOGAN to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (KAA) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through December 14, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the 402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). A form motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee is being provided for your use. NOTE TO PRISONER - If you seek leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee, and you are a prisoner, your motion must be accompanied by a copy of the transactions associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (Attachments: #1 Form Motion for IFP) (MEH) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

5 #1

Form Motion for IFP

#7

(#7) MOTION to Receive Documents by E-Service, filed by Plaintiff RASHAAD HOGAN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TPS) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

7 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address for RASHAAD HOGAN - Currently located at INDIANA STATE PRISON (Previously located at WVCF). RASHAAD HOGAN is no longer participating in E-Service. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TPS) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

8 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Mail Returned re #7 MOTION sent to RASHAAD HOGAN. (TPS) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

#10

(#10) Mail Returned as undeliverable. #8 Notice of Change of Address - Prisoner/Pro Se sent to the Court by RASHAAD HOGAN. (Plaintiff's address has been updated. ) (KAA) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Mail Returned as undeliverable. #8 Notice of Change of Address - Prisoner/Pro Se sent to the Court by RASHAAD HOGAN. (Plaintiff's address has been updated. ) (KAA) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Mail Returned re #7 MOTION sent to RASHAAD HOGAN. (TPS) (Entered: 12/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Change of Address for RASHAAD HOGAN - Currently located at INDIANA STATE PRISON (Previously located at WVCF). RASHAAD HOGAN is no longer participating in E-Service. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (TPS) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Receive Documents by E-Service, filed by Plaintiff RASHAAD HOGAN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TPS) (Entered: 12/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • Docket(#6) RECEIPT #2816 for filing fee in the amount of $402.00, paid by RASHAAD HOGAN. (DRB) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through December 14, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: You must either pay the 402.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that you lack the financial ability to do so by filing a motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee (in forma pauperis). A form motion for leave to proceed without the prepayment of the filing fee is being provided for your use. NOTE TO PRISONER - If you seek leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee, and you are a prisoner, your motion must be accompanied by a copy of the transactions associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. (Attachments: #1 Form Motion for IFP) (MEH) (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT to Prisoner E-Service by RASHAAD HOGAN located at WVCF. Pursuant to General Order 2013-1, documents submitted by RASHAAD HOGAN to the court for filing will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing that will constitute official service upon registered users of CM/ECF. If any parties to the case are not registered CM/ECF users, the Clerk of the Court will mail the document via U.S. Postal Service on behalf of the inmate. NOTE: The E-Filing Program does not affect the obligation of other parties to serve copies of documents in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (KAA) (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. mail. (MEH) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (KAA) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against KOZATEK, MALLOTT, MURRAY, NORTON, T. TUMEY, VAUGHN, YARBER, filed by RASHAAD HOGAN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KAA) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less