This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 08:40:42 (UTC).

Hogan et al v. Central Loan Administration and Reporting et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Hogan filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Central Loan Administration and Reporting. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William B. Shubb and Allison Claire. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00039

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William B. Shubb

Referral Judge

Allison Claire

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas M Hogan

Sacramento, CA 95825

Ru Hogan

Thomas M. Hogan

Sacramento, CA 95825

Defendants

Central Loan Administration and Reporting d/b/a Cenlar FSB

Citibank

Citibank NA

Citigroup

Central Loan Administration d/b/a Cenlar FSB

Cenlar FSB

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas M. Hogan

Attorney at Law Office of Thomas M. Hogan

720 Howe Ave., Suite 113

Sacramento, CA 95825

John Steve Sargetis

Attorney at United Law Center, PC

3301 Watt Ave., Suite 500

Sacramento, CA 95821

Defendant Attorneys

Helen Looney

3 Embarcadero Center, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Helen Goodman

Attorney at Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP

3 Embarcadero Center, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jessica B. Coffield

Attorney at Wolfe & Wyman LLP

980 9Th St., Suite 1750

Sacramento, CA 95814

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Cenlar FSB re #17 Motion to Dismiss, #18 Request for Judicial Notice, #19 Motion to Strike. (Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Coll, A). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

19 #2

Proposed Order

19 #1

Points and Authorities

18 #3

Proposed Order

18 #2

Exhibit

18 #1

Exhibit

18 #18

Main Document

17 #2

Proposed Order

17 #17

Main Document

3 #2

Proposed Order

3 #3

Main Document

2 #2

VDRP

2 #1

Consent Form

2 #2

Main Document

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Interested Parties

1 #1

Declaration of Helen C. Looney

1 #1

Main Document

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Cenlar FSB re #17 Motion to Dismiss, #18 Request for Judicial Notice, #19 Motion to Strike. (Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Coll, A). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to STRIKE by Cenlar FSB. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Coll, A). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Cenlar FSB re #17 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Coll, A). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to DISMISS by Cenlar FSB. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order)(Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Coll, A). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to DISMISS by Citibank NA. Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goodman, Helen) Modified on 3/2/2022 (Coll, A). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/17/2022 SUBSTITUTING attorney John Steve Sargetis in place of attorney Thomas M. Hogan. (Huang, H) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) WITHDRAWAL of #7 Motion to Dismiss filed by Cenlar FSB, #6 Motion to Strike, filed by Cenlar FSB. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Coffield, Jessica) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WITHDRAWAL of #10 Motion to Dismiss filed by Citibank NA. (Goodman, Helen) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Thomas M. Hogan, Ru Hogan. Attorney Sargetis, John Steve added.(Sargetis, John) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Ru Hogan, Thomas M. Hogan. (Sargetis, John) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Cenlar FSB re #8 Request for Judicial Notice, #6 MOTION to STRIKE Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint, #7 MOTION to DISMISS. (Coffield, Jessica) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Cenlar FSB re #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Coffield, Jessica) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to DISMISS by Cenlar FSB. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2022 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities , #2 Proposed Order)(Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 1/27/2022 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to STRIKE Portions of Plaintiffs' Complaint, by Cenlar FSB. Motion Hearing set for 3/7/2022 at 01:30 PM before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order , #2 Notice)(Coffield, Jessica) Modified on 1/27/2022 (Kastilahn, A). (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Citibank NA of #2 New Case Documents. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Looney, Helen) Modified on 1/12/2022 (Coll, A). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/11/2022 GRANTING #3 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to respond by 1/26/2022. (Kirksey Smith, K) (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for EXTENSION of TIME to FILE ANSWER by Citibank NA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Helen C. Looney, #2 Proposed Order)(Looney, Helen) Modified on 1/12/2022 (Coll, A). (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2022 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketRECEIPT number ACAEDC-10002708 for $402.00 for Civil Filing Fee from Helen Looney. (Kastilahn, A) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Placer County Superior Court, case number S-CV-0047363 by Ru Hogan, Thomas M Hogan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Helen C. Looney, #2 Notice of Interested Parties, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Looney, Helen) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL LOAN ADMINISTRATION AND REPORTING is a litigant

Latest cases where Citigroup Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Helen Claire Looney