This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/13/2021 at 10:14:52 (UTC).

Hoffman v. Thras.io Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Hoffman filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Thras io Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patti B. Saris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-12224

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patti B. Saris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sasha Hoffman

Defendants

Carlos Cashman

Thras.io Inc.

Joshua Silberstein

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sean T. Carnathan

Attorney at O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

1 Van De Graaff Drive, Suite 104

Burlington, MA 01803

Defendant Attorneys

Michael E. Welsh

Attorney at Cooley LLP

500 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02116-3736

Bronwyn L. Roberts

Attorney at Cooley LLP

500 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02116

Gerard D. O'Shea

Attorney at Cooley LLP

1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Reply Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc.. (Welsh, Michael) Modified text on 2/5/2021 (Baker, Casey). (Entered: 02/04/2021)

21 #1

Exhibit Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss

#21

(#21) MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss)(Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

19 #1

Exhibit A

#19

(#19) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Sasha Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

18 #1

Exhibit A

#18

(#18) STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#14

(#14) Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc..(Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#12

(#17) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2021 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Hearing.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2021 10:30 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard D. O'Shea on behalf of Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc. (O'Shea, Gerard) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thras.io Inc.. (Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Bronwyn L. Roberts on behalf of Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc. (Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Welsh on behalf of Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc. (Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc.. (Welsh, Michael) (Main Document 2 flattened and replaced on 12/16/2020) (Baker, Casey). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8554517 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Reply Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc.. (Welsh, Michael) Modified text on 2/5/2021 (Baker, Casey). (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Reply ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendants' Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Dismiss)(Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Resetting Hearing on Motion #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing RESET for 2/25/2021 09:30 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Sasha Hoffman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STATE COURT Record. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint : This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Motion Hearing set for 2/10/2021 11:00 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2021 before Judge Saris has been CANCELED, and will be rescheduled after the Motion to Dismiss has been ruled on, if necessary. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Judge Patti B. Saris: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #14 Motion to Continue. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Joint MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc..(Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 12/28/2020 to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc..(Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Hearing.This hearing will be conducted by video conference. Counsel of record will receive a video conference invite at the email registered in CM/ECF. If you have technical or compatibility issues with the technology, please notify the session's courtroom deputy as soon as possible.Access to the hearing will be made available to the media and public. In order to gain access to the hearing, you must sign up at the following address: #https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/courtlist.html. For questions regarding access to hearings, you may refer to the Court's general orders and public notices available on #www.mad.uscourts.gov or contact media@mad.uscourts.gov. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2021 10:30 AM in Remote Proceeding : Boston before Judge Patti B. Saris. (Baker, Casey) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard D. O'Shea on behalf of Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc. (O'Shea, Gerard) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thras.io Inc.. (Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docket(#6) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Currie, Haley) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Patti B. Saris assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Bronwyn L. Roberts on behalf of Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc. (Roberts, Bronwyn) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E. Welsh on behalf of Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc. (Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc.. (Welsh, Michael) (Main Document 2 flattened and replaced on 12/16/2020) (Baker, Casey). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carlos Cashman, Joshua Silberstein, Thras.io Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8554517 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Welsh, Michael) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bronwyn L. Roberts